Rovai-Pickett v. HMS Host, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Linda Rovai-Pickett
Defendant: HMS Host, Inc and Hotel Employees & Restaurant Employees Local #2
Case Number: 3:2008cv01625
Filed: March 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER APPROVING APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. The application of Nancy Morrison O'Connor, Keith M. Henneke, and Robert E. Sheeder to withdraw as counsel of record is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 15, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2010.
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of HMS Host, Inc, Hotel Employees & Restaurant Employees Local #2 against Linda Rovai-Pickett. Defendants' motions for summary judgment are, in each instance, hereby GRANTED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 8, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING 99 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KEITH M. HENNEKE PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO FURTHER EXTEND THE NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DEADLINE. The non-expert discovery cutoff is extended to July 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DEADLINE. The non-expert discovery cutoff is extended to June 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF WILLIAM HENSHALL TO FEDERAL BUILDING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 8/3/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/20/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to November 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rovai-Pickett v. HMS Host, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rovai-Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS Host, Inc
Represented By: Matthew D. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Employees & Restaurant Employees Local #2
Represented By: John Charles Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?