Ahmed v. Gonzalez
Plaintiff: Saeed Ahmed
Defendant: Emilio T. Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2008cv01680
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Immigration Actions Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/02/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending abeyance of action sixty days; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/23/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Stipulation filed by Jonathan Scharfen. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 1/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: The parties SHALL SUBMIT simultaneous briefs, each not to exceed five (5) pages, discussing the relevance of Hassan, if any, to the instant case. These briefs shall be submitted within fourteen (14) days of entry of this order; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/23/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with 30 days leave to amend; (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is DENIED; To facilitate the disposition of the cross-motions for summary judgment, the court ORDERS the government to file, no later than January 26, 2009, a declaration from a USCIS official with personal knowledge of the following, explaining: (1) the broad outline of how the review of Tier-III terrorist organizations pursuant to the CAA and USCISs March 26, 2008, inter nal memorandum is occurring; (2) the number of groups for which a review is completed each month; (3) how many groups have been exempted so far; (4) how many groups have not been exempted so far; and (5) how long the typical review has taken. The co urt also ORDERS the government to file, also no later than January 26, 2009, an authenticated copy of the Tier III terrorist organization list used by USCIS in its adjudications. The court will entertain a motion by the government to seal documents if and as necessary, pursuant to the procedures set forth in Civil Local Rule 79-5.(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Status Conference to 2/9/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/22/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeed Ahmed
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio T. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?