December 15, 2011 |
Filing
116
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROCESS SETTLEMENT PAYMENT. Defendants shall deliver the settlement payment to plaintiff as outlined in the settlement agreement by February 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
|
October 7, 2011 |
Filing
108
ORDER GRANTING BARTKO, ZANKEL, TARRANT & MILLER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW; DENYING PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO TERMINATE AND FOR OTHER RELIEF; VACATING OCTOBER 14, 2011 HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
|
July 29, 2011 |
Filing
93
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims alleged against defendants are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
|
July 19, 2011 |
Filing
91
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXCUSE PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF PARTIES AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Dfts Godinez and Machado are excused from personal attendance at the settlement conference on 7/28/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/19/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
|
April 25, 2011 |
Filing
89
ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE ATSETTLEMENT CONFERENCEfor 7/28/11 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/25/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The settlement conference scheduled for May 4, 2011 is continued to July 28, 2011, provided that Magistrate Judge Spero can accommodate the parties on his July 28, 2011 calendar. Each party is limited to noticing only party depositions prior to the settlement conference, and shall identify and schedule any non-party depositions in advance of the settlement conference to the extent possible. The non-expert discovery cutoff is extended to August 12, 2011. The deadline to designate experts is extended to August 26, 2011. The deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is extended to September 9, 2011. The expert discovery deadline is extended to October 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
|
April 7, 2011 |
Filing
82
ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on 5/4/11 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/6/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
|
April 1, 2011 |
Filing
79
ORDER RE: EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF DEFENDANT MACHADO AND EXTENDING DATE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The deadline for plaintiff to serve Machado is extended to April 15, 2011. The April 6, 2011 Settlement Conference is vacate d, and the parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero's chambers to determine an available date to which the Settlement Conference may be continued. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
76
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
75
ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/9/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
68
SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
67
INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
66
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2011. (Attachment A: # 1 )(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
64
ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
|
February 8, 2011 |
Filing
60
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GODINEZ'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION; VACATING ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT MACHADO; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Godinez is directed to file under seal, no later than five court days from the date of this order, the last known addre ss of Machado. The Court's order of April 17, 2009 dismissing Dearing's claims against Machado is vacated. No later than ten court days from the date of this order, counsel for the parties are directed to meet and confer as to the language of a proposed protective order. Upon the Court's approval of a protective order, Godinez is directed to serve counsel for Dearing with Machado's address. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
|
December 17, 2010 |
Filing
55
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/17/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing
52
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 13, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT; DENYING 45 , 46 , 47 PENDING MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing
44
WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Plaintiff for settlement conference to Solano State Prison July 8, 2010 issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on June 4, 2010. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing
37
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Staying discovery pending disposition of defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/2/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing
31
ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS: DENYING 22 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; GRANTING 23 LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD MACHADO; GRANTING 24 MOTION TO SERVE DISCOVERY; DISMISSING DEFENDANT MACHADO UNDER RULE 4(m); SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER GRANTING 18 DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
|
September 26, 2008 |
Filing
5
ORDER OF SERVICE. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint & 6 Amended Complaint in this matter, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Correctional Officer Machado and Correctional Officer Godinez, at Salinas Valley State Prison. The Clerk shall also mail courtesy copies of the complaint and this order to the California Attorney General's Office. Within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or other dispositive motion with respect to the claim found to be cognizable. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/29/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
|