Federal Trade Commission v. Nextclick Media LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission alleges that Defendants NextClick Media, LLC, Next Internet LLC, Kenneth Chan and Albert Chen operate several websites advertising for sale over the Internet free trials of various products. Although Defendants claim that the trial of the product is free or that there is no cost to try the product other than a small shipping and handling charge, consumers who elect to keep the product (including the trial product) are charged the same price that is charged for a month's supply. Although Defendants claim that consumers will receive a full refund upon returning unused product from the initial shipment, consumer who elect to return unused product must pay the postage for returning the product and are assessed a restocking fee as well.

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Nextclick Media LLC, Next Internet LLC, Kenneth Chan and Albert Chen
Case Number: 3:2008cv01718
Filed: March 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re doc 49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice against defendant Next Internet LLC filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/3/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 44 Stipulation filed by Federal Trade Commission. The Defendant's time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including 11/2/2009. The case management conference currently scheduled for 9/24/2009 is rescheduled to 12/17/2009 at 3:30 PM and that the date for filing of the joint case management statement is extended to 12/11/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on September 17, 2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for filing Responsive pleadings to and including 8/3/2009 and continue case management conference from 6/25/2009 to 9/24/2009 at 3:30 PM re doc 42 filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/5/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re 37 Stipulation filed by Federal Trade Commission. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 5/4/2009. The case management conference shall be rescheduled from 3/26/2009 to 6/25/2009 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/30/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009) .
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS to and including 2/2/2009 re [doc #35] filed by Federal Trade Commission. The case management conference currently scheduled for 1/22/2009 shall be rescheduled to 3/26/2009 at 3:30 PM. Joint statement shall be due 3/16/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/1/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS until 12/1/2008 re 33 filed by Federal Trade Commission. The case management conference shall be rescheduled from 10/16/2008 to 1/22/2009 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/12/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Nextclick Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextclick Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Internet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?