Campanelli et al v. The Hershey Company
Plaintiff: Julie Campanelli, Sabrina Anderson, Nancy Smith, Taryn Sedgeley, Francis McKeever, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Josephine Godfrey, John Michalski, Juan Carlos Lopez, Karen Metzger, Robert Musolf, Scott Wood, Chris Nielsen, Anne Compton, Phyllis Davis, Andrew Levison, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Daniel Hallaran, Ron Roberts, Kim Tracy, Ryan Parsons and Kevin Shanahan
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv01862
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:08-cv-01862-BZ; granting (130) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05117-BZ (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO COMPLETE ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/18/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER FOR NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/13/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/10/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER ON SCOPE OF NOTICE UNDER 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/6/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 457 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zimmerman on 2/29/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:08-cv-01862-BZ; granting (63) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:11-cv-05117-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:08-cv-01862-BZ; granting (59) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05117-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER CONTINUING APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/5/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER RE STIPULATION CONTINUING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/11/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER RE TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/10/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 389 SCHEDULING ORDER RE OVERTIME CHARGES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER re 372 Objection,, filed by The Hershey Company, 364 Reply Memorandum,,,, filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Chris Nielsen, Scott Wood, Ron Roberts, Juan Carlos Lopez, Sabrina Anderson, Robert Musolf, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/23/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 303 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 SECOND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/11/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 CORRECTED ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS FROM COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/2/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE RE: Framroze J. Virjee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating motion hearing anddenying 304 Motion to Strike (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/21/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER RE EXTENSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/19/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER FOLLOWING DECEMBER 20, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE re 300 Notice (Other) filed by The Hershey Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 FOURTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/21/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/7/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER REGARDING POSTCARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/24/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER re 211 Letter filed by The Hershey Company, 214 Letter filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Chris Nielsen, Phyllis Davis, Scott Wood, Ron Roberts, Juan Carlos Lopez, Sabrina Anderson, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison, 210 Letter filed by The Hershey Company, 209 Letter filed by The Hers hey Company, 216 Letter filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Phyllis Davis, Chris Nielsen, Scott Wood, Juan Carlos Lopez, Ron Roberts, Sabrina An derson, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison, 208 Letter filed by The Hershey Company, 238 Response filed by The Hershey Company, 215 Letter filed by Ke vin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Phyllis Davis, Chris Nielsen, Scott Wood, Juan Carlos Lopez, Ron Roberts, Sabrina Anderson, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison, 217 Letter filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parso ns, Phyllis Davis, Chris Nielsen, Scott Wood, Juan Carlos Lopez, Ron Roberts, Sabrina Anderson, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/17/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/5/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER RE NOTICE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING MOTION re 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Chris Nielsen, Phyllis Davis, Scott Woo d, Ron Roberts, Juan Carlos Lopez, Sabrina Anderson, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison. DENIED by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/30/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Certify Class; (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 148 Motion to Strike (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 126 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER re 111 Letter filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Chris Nielsen, Phyllis Davis, Scott Wood, Ron Roberts, Juan Carlos Lope z, Sabrina Anderson, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison, 112 Letter filed by The Hershey Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/11/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REOPENING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/20/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 100 Motion to Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF KIM TRACY WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/5/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 82 Stipulation filed by The Hershey Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/4/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FIRST DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE re 75 Letter, filed by The Hershey Company, 74 Letter filed by Kevin Shanahan, Josephine Godfrey, Taryn Sedgeley, Bryan Miller, James Amicarella, Julie Campanelli, John Michalski, Ryan Parsons, Chr is Nielsen, Phyllis Davis, Scott Wood, Ron Roberts, Juan Carlos Lopez, Sabrina Anderson, Kim Tracy, Charlotte Bryn Allen, Robert Musolf, Karen Metzger, Daniel Hallaran, Nancy Smith, Francis McKeever, Anne Compton, Andrew Levison, 73 Letter filed by The Hershey Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/25/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/8/2010 to Allow Plaintiffs to File a Third Amended Complaint & Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to same. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/30/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/7/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re Joint Letter Dated August 5, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/7/2009.(hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Continuing CMC to 8/6/2009 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 5/26/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re Discovery Dispute Raised in Joint Letter Dated May 15, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 5/18/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Approving Parties' Proposal to Provide Further Status Report by 5/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 5/13/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 38 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/12/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009) Modified on 3/17/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE JANUARY 28, 2009 STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/12/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campanelli et al v. The Hershey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Campanelli
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Anderson
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Smith
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taryn Sedgeley
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis McKeever
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Miller
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Amicarella
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Godfrey
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michalski
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Lopez
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Metzger
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Musolf
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wood
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Nielsen
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Compton
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Davis
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Levison
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Bryn Allen
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hallaran
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Roberts
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Tracy
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Parsons
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Shanahan
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Michael William Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?