Jackson et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Jamal Jackson and Jannie Mendez
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong, Jesse Serna, Gary Moriyama and San Francisco Police Officers and Employees
Case Number: 3:2008cv01916
Filed: April 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/9/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER SESSION re 59 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Declaration of Warren Metlitzky in Support of Defendants' Administrative Request for a Telephonic Conference to Enforce The Meet and Confer Requirement or for an Alternative Procedure filed by City and County of San Francisco, 58 MOTION to Appear by Telephone DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE TO ENFORCE THE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT OR FOR AN ALTERNATIVE PROCEDURE filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DISCOVERY ORDER re 56 Letter filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/24/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/23/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CORRECTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE re 35 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING CMC; CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/9/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 17, 2009. PARTIES SHALL CONTACT JUDGE LARSON CHAMBERS AFTER THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARIA-ELENA JAMES. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/11/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/17/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/30/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Jackson
Represented By: Robert C. Cheasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannie Mendez
Represented By: Robert C. Cheasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Serna
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Moriyama
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Officers and Employees
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?