Karim v. Mukasey et al
Plaintiff: Bashir Karim
Defendant: Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Robert S. Mueller, III, Christina Poulos and Robin Barrett
Case Number: 3:2008cv01920
Filed: April 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Immigration Actions Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/18/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: monetary sanctions and order to show cause. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/25/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend date of parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. The hearing date of 10/29/08 is vacated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/23/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Order To Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on September 8, 2008. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karim v. Mukasey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bashir Karim
Represented By: Shah Iqbal Nawaaz Peerally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?