Fulford v. Logitech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arthur Fulford
Defendant: Logitech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv02041
Filed: April 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING LOGITECH, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Michael A. Fitzgerald is ordered to pay Logitech fees in the amount of $5000. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 CLERK'S JUDGMENT : The action is dismissed on the merits with prejudice and without costs or attorneys fees to any party except as otherwise provided in the Order Granting Attorneys Fees and Costs and Service Award to the Named Plaintiff. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE SUPPLEMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE. Defendant is directed to file, no later than March 2, 2010 at 4:00 p.m., a supplement to its Statement and, specifically, to state therein the number of claims made. In light o f defendant's assertion that such information should not be publicly disclosed, the Court will allow defendant to file such supplement under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER (1) GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL TO THE REVISED PROPOSED SETTLEMENT; (2) PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT CLASS; (3) APPROVING THE PROPOSED NOTICE PLAN AND REVISED FORM OF NOTICE; AND (4) SCHEDULING THE FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING. The deadline to postmark a claim form, opt out, or object to the settlement is January 28, 2010. The deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval and Award of Attorneys' Fees is February 19, 2010. The fairness hearing will be conducted on March 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. The hearing on plaintiff's motion is advanced from October 9, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. to October 9, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER STAYING ACTION; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: extending deadline for Dft to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/19/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING MARCH 27, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to May 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING UNTIL JANUARY 12, 2009 PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint no later than December 12, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 31, 2008 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. David P. Meyer is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Matthew R. Wilson is denied without prejudice. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The Case Management Conference is continued to December 12, 2008. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued to October 31, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulford v. Logitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Fulford
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Law, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?