Ramirez v. Curry
Case Number: 3:2008cv02159
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 29, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and the petition, along with exhibits lodged in support thereof, upon respondent and respondent's counsel, the Attorney General for the State of California. Respon dent shall file with the Court and serve on petitioner, within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, an answer conforming in all respects to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, showing cause wny a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted based on petitioner's cognizable claims. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/29/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?