Cain v. Allstate Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Les Cain
Defendant: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv02267
Filed: May 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 9, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE RUTZ TESTIMONY RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURPOSES [re 53 Letter filed by Les Cain]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/31/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF ANTHONY RUTZ [re 44 Letter filed by Allstate Life Insurance Company]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE (IN-COURT HEARING ON 8/7/2009 AT 9:00 AM) [re 40 Letter filed by Les Cain]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/3/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 30 Letter, filed by Les Cain]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/22/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain v. Allstate Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Cain
Represented By: Debra Fink Bogaards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?