Cotterill v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Cotterill
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Mathew Mason, Hugh Hall, Gregory Hicks, Leon Loew, Heather Fong, Mitchell Katz, Regents of the University of California, Paul Davies, Gavin Newsom, John Crudo, Anne Braun, Ester Choo, Trudy Singzon, Jessica Fogler, Regina Graham, Tamar Seiver, Frederick Huang, Hurbert Ochitill, RicK Patel, Alicia F. Lieberman, Mark Leary, Robert Okin and Robert Dynes
Case Number: 3:2008cv02295
Filed: May 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER RE: SANCTIONS AMOUNT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE PENDING MANDATE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/29/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER ADOPTING 279 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 226 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expert Costs and 230 City Defendants' MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expert Witness Fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 11, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER RE OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge 3/25/10 on 3/25/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/9/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER REFERRING MOTION RE COSTS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LARSON. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 178 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING 217 Defendants Leave to File 14-page Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER re Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Staying Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 1, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re Motion for Summary Judgment Opposition and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING 199 Modified Stipulation re Summary Judgment Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 27, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 164 Motion to Dismiss The Regents. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS re 164 MOTION to Dismiss Eighteenth and Nineteenth Causes of Action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 18, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/18/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING 145 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document From the Electronic Filing System. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss and granting 102 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/28/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RE INTERROGATORIES DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 22/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009) Modified on 2/24/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re 94 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 28, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 63 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 21, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re 74 MOTION for Administrative Relief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Depositions Dispute. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 58 Stipulation for Additional Time to File Stipulation and Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 7, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 39 Motion for Administrative Relief and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Issued. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 36 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation Extending Deadline to Complete Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 5, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotterill v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Cotterill
Represented By: Gregory M. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Mason
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Hall
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hicks
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Loew
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Katz
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crudo
Represented By: Scott David Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ester Choo
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Singzon
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Fogler
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Graham
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamar Seiver
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Huang
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurbert Ochitill
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RicK Patel
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia F. Lieberman
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Leary
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Okin
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dynes
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?