United States of America v. Approximately $104,994 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $104,994 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2008cv02331
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 31 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/14/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/22/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 26 Notice (Other) filed by Todd Donald Dunphy. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/14/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS until 10/21/09 AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/7/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (ga, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/19/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/9/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $104,994 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $104,994 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?