Intel Corporation v. Intelcom, Inc.

Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Defendant: Intelcom, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv02334
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court judgment with judge's signature (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 30, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Judgment against defendant Intelcom, Inc. pursuant to order granting plaintiff Intel Corporation's motion for Terminating Sanction. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 21, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS re 73 , 88 . The Court adopts plaintiff's amended proposed judgment and orders that judgment be entered in plaintiff's favor according to the terms proposed, except that the Corut grants defendant 60 days from the date the judgment is entered to submit a written report setting forth the manner in which it has compiled with the terms of the judgment. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
May 22, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS and GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
March 24, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/24/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 12, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 03:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/12/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 9, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/6/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 14, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting motion to withdraw for 1/23/09 @ 9 a.m. any opposition shall be filed by 1/16/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/14/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
September 8, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Intelcom's request for an extension to file responsive pleading to 9/19/08.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intel Corporation v. Intelcom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Yuka Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelcom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?