Gonzalez v. Walker et al
Petitioner: Armando R. Gonzalez
Respondent: James Walker and James E. Tilton
Case Number: 3:2008cv02389
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 41 , 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal; Denying 42 , 45 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/12/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 30 Motion for Transcripts; Granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse; Denying 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer due by 12/5/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando R. Gonzalez
Represented By: Jamie L. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?