Somerville v. Stryker Orthopedics et al
Plaintiff: Goldene Somerville
Defendant: Stryker Orthopedics, Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv02443
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING Modified 81 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 21, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 79 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 73 Modified Stipulation re Dates and Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss and granting 66 Motion to Vacate Dates. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 47 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 10, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 Stipulation FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re: Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge January 16, 2009 GRANTING 10 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 7, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/23/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MDL ORDER DENYING Transfer signed by Acting Chairman J. Frederick Motz. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somerville v. Stryker Orthopedics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goldene Somerville
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Orthopedics
Represented By: Jeffrey Speiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Speiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Speiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Speiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?