Huq et al v. Sanyo North America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Farhana Huq, Josette Molloy and Creating Economic Opportunities for Women, Inc.
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation, Lenovo (United States) Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation and Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2008cv02614
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER Trial Setting Conference set for 2/20/09 is continued to 4/17/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/18/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/17/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Substitution of Attorney and Order for Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/10/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huq et al v. Sanyo North America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farhana Huq
Represented By: Charles O. Geerhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josette Molloy
Represented By: Charles O. Geerhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creating Economic Opportunities for Women, Inc.
Represented By: Charles O. Geerhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Mark Lim Cokee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Mark Lim Cokee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation
Represented By: Mark Lim Cokee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Lim Cokee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?