George et al v. Sonoma County Sherrif's Department et al
Plaintiff: Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp and Donald George
Defendant: Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., R.N. Michael E. Dagey, Elizabeth Kaiser, M.D. James Luders, Laura Rodriguez, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Edward W. Hard, Jr., Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel, Norick Janian and Angus Matheson, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2008cv02675
Filed: May 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 627 DOCUMENT LOCATOR: TRIAL EXHIBITS: JURY QUESTIONAIRE: INSIDE COURT VAULT: SHELF NUMBER 3. Re Per Chambers (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 626 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Determination of Good Faith Settlement re #625 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/8/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 625 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER re Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Joseph N. Matel, M.D., Richard Flinders, M.D.UCHAMP. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against Sutter Defendants re #612 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/16/2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by MagistrateJudge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/15/11. As per Chambers(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 622 RESPONSE (re #612 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Minor's Compromise with Sutter Defendants ) Non-Opposition to Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims filed bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 621 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. REFER TO DOCUMENT #622 . *** RESPONSE (re #612 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Minor's Compromise with Sutter Defendants ) Non Opposition to Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims filed bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 12/13/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Responses due by 12/13/2011. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/1/2011. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER granting re #618 Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 618 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Norick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE: Responses due by 12/13/2011. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/28/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 616 [Proposed] Order Granting re #612 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against Sutter Defendants filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 615 Declaration of Tajmah Beauchamp in Support of re #612 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against Sutter Defendants filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #612 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 614 Declaration of Valerie George in Support of re #612 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against Sutter Defendants filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #612 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 613 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #612 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against Sutter Defendants filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #612 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 612 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against Sutter Defendants filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/6/2011. Replies due by 12/13/2011. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/2/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Order Following Review of Independent Third Party Expert Report. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/27/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER MODIFYING TRIAL DATES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/08/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER DENYING re #590 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/22/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 607 REPLY to re #590 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) -TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF- filed by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 606 RESPONSE to re #590 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) -Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Sutter's Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law- filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 605 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2011 before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte re doc #590 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) filed by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health; matter submitted, order to be prepared by court. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re #603 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 603 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Hearing on the Rule 50 (b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, doc #598 MOVED TO 2:00 PM on 5/19/2011 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 602 REPLY Brief in support of re #590 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b) filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 601 RESPONSE to re #590 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Rule 50(b)- -Plaintiffs' Opposition- filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Following discussions with counsel regarding the re-trial of this case, the Court sets a further pretrial conference on December 13, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. The trial is set for January 9, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/20/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 599 Minute Entry: Telephone Scheduling Conference held. (Date Filed: 4/18/2011). (Recording #ftr 10:12 - 10:22.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 NOTICE: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 598 STIPULATION & ORDER as modified re #596 . Signed by Magistate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/5/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 597 Letter from Defendants re New Supreme Court Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 596 STIPULATION AND [Proposed] Order Re Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Sutter Defendants' Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 595 [Proposed] Order Granting re #593 Re-notice Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 594 Declaration of Cameron J. Whitehead in Support of re #593 Re-notice of Hearing on re #590 Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a matter of Law filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #593 ) (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 593 Re-Notice of Hearing on re #590 Rule 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law -Rule 50(b)- filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing re-set for 5/3/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 592 [Proposed] Order Granting re #590 Rule 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 591 Declaration of Cameron J. Whitehead in Support of re #590 Rule 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #590 ) (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 590 RULE 50(b) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law -Rule 50(b)-filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 589 Minute Entry: Jury unable to reach unanimous verdict. Jury Trial completed on 2/23/2011. (Court Reporter Debra Pas) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 585 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 2-10-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 588 Minute Entry: Further Jury deliberations held on 2/22/2011. Jury to return 2/23/2011.(Court Reporter Debra Pas) (Attachments: #1 Trial worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 587 Minute Entry: Further Jury Trial held on 2/18/2011. Further Jury deliberations 2/22/2011.(Court Reporter Debra Pas) (Attachments: #1 Trial worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER RE LUNCH FOR JURORS DURING TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/18/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 586 Minute Entry: Further Jury Trial held on 2/17/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (Attachments: #1 Trial worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/16/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 582 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/16/2011. Closing arguments. Jury instructions read. Jury begins deliberations. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn) (Attachments: #1 Trial worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 581 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 8, held on 2-16-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 580 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/15/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Witnesses: Cage Johnson, Leslie Dorfman. Jury instructions given. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 578 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 7, held on 2-15-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 577 MOTION for Directed Verdict Striking Defendant's Superseding Cause Affirmative Defense and Related Jury Instruction filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 576 TRIAL BRIEF To Exclude Extrinsic Evidence of Mailers Sent by Dr. Rubenstein filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 579 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/14/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Witnesses: Karen Saylor, Lisa Amador, Christine Bartel, Valerie George, Joyce Homenko, Bryan Petker, Cage Johnson. Further trial 2/15/2011 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 575 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 6, held on 2-14-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 574 Rule 50(a) MOTION filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 573 TRIAL BRIEF on Health Care Providers' Discretion Under State and Federal Law to Disclose Medical Information of an Incapacitated Patient filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 13, 2011 Filing 571 [Proposed] Changes to Jury Instructions Based Upon Narrowing of Claims filed by Donald George, Valerie George, Sutter Health, -Plaintiffs Proposed Changes to Jury Instructions Based Upon Narrowing of Claims. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2011)
February 13, 2011 Filing 570 [Proposed] Verdict Form filed by Donald George, Valerie George -Parties' Joint Verdict Form-. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 572 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/11/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Further trial set for 2/14/2011 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 569 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 5, held on 2-11-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L.Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER Re #564 . Defendants County of Sonoma, Michael E. Dagey, James Luders, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc. and Bill Cogbill are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/11/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER RE: PARTIES' STIPULATIONS REGARDING JURY INSTRUCTIONS (re: Docket No. 549). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/11/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 567 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/10/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Witnesses: Richard Flinders, Nieves Douglas, Elaine Debeni, Richard Rubenstein, Michael Dagey. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 565 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #585 . *** Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 2-11-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 Filing 564 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Sonoma County Sheriffs Department; Bill Cogbill; County Of Sonoma; California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.; James Luders, M.D.; and Michael E. Dagey, R.N. with [Proposed] Order filed by Donald George, Valerie George (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 562 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #551 MOTION for Revision of Proposed Jury Instruction and Verdict Form filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #551 ) (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 561 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 3, held on 2-9-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 563 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/9/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Witnesses: Joseph Matel, Elliot Vichinsky. Further Jury Trial 2/10/2011 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 559 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING Ryan George's Personal History and Prior Acts re #556 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/9/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 558 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S NET WORTH re #555 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 560 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/8/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Witnesses: Angus Matheson, Edward Hard, Joseph Matel. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Worksheet) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 557 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 2-8-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 556 Revised Stipulation & [Proposed] Order Regarding Ryan George's Personal History & Prior Bad Acts filed by Donald George, Valerie George, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 555 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendant Sutter's Net Worth filed by Donald George, Valerie George, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 554 Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 2/7/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Witness called: Angus Matheson. (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Lydia Zinn.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 553 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 2-7-2011, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 552 Emergency MOTION To (1) Require Disclosure Of Financial Data For Sutter West Bay Hospitals d/b/a Sutter Medical Center Of Santa Rosa, And (2) To Join Or Substitute Sutter West Bay Hospitals As A Named Defendant Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(C) filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits A-D)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 5, 2011 Filing 551 MOTION for Revision of Proposed Jury Instruction and Verdict Form filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/5/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 550 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/13/11, before Judge ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2011. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 549 STIPULATION of Parties' Regarding Jury Instructions filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 548 Letter from Steven L. Wittels re Negligent Infliction Claim and Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 547 STIPULATION and [proposed] Order Regarding Ryan George's Personal History and Prior Acts filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Valerie George, Donald George, Tajmah Beauchamp. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 546 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Exhibit List, Proposed Exhibits 11A-E in Place of Previous Exhibit 11 filed by Donald George, Valerie George.. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER that the U.S. District Court Jury Commissioner shall furnish daily morning refreshments for the members of the jury beginning 2/7/2011, at 8:00 a.m., for the duration of the trial, at the expense of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/1/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS to bring attendant equipment to the Courtroom re #542 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011).
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS' to bring services of Doar Litigation Consulting and Attendant Equipment to Courtroom re #541 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 542 Unopposed Administrative MOTION To Bring Attendant Equipment Into Courtroom By Defendants filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cameron Whitehead In Support of Motion to Bring Attendant Equipment Into Courtroom, #2 Proposed Order In Support of Defendants Motion to Bring Attendant Equipment Into Courtroom)(Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 541 Unopposed Administrative MOTION To Bring Services of DOAR Litigation Consulting and Attendant Equipment Into Courtroom filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven L. Wittels, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 540 Response to re #537 Sutter's Objections to Verdict Form filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 539 Final Revised Joint Jury Questionnaire filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 538 Minute Entry: Further Pretrial Conference held on 1/27/2011. (Court Reporter Debra Pas) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 537 OBJECTIONS to the Verdict Form Proposed by the Court filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 536 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions on Ratification and Delegation filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 535 Proposed Jury Instructions on Delegation & Ratification filed by Donald George, Valerie George Pltfs Proposed Instructions re Delegation and Ratification. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 534 [Proposed] Jury Instructions on Delegation & Ratification filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa Re Delegation and Ratification. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER GRANTING Request of Defendant's Lead Counsel, Barry Vogel, to appear telephonically at the further pretrial conference re #531 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER GRANTING LEAD COUNSEL, Steven Wittels, to appear telephonically at the futher pretrial conference re #530 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 531 REQUEST of Defendants' Lead Counsel, Barry Vogel, to Appear Telephonically at Further Pretrial Conference filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2011 11:15 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Vogel, Barry) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 530 REQUEST of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Steven L. Wittels, to Appear Telephonically at Further Pretrial Conference filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 529 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions filed by Donald George, Valerie George -Plaintiffs' Proposed Subset of Preliminary Jury Instructions-. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 528 Proposed Statement Regarding Ryan Goerge's Personal History & Prior Bad Acts filed by Donald George, Valerie George -Plaintiffs' Proposed Statement of Facts to Jury re Decedents' Personal History and Prior Bad Acts-. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 527 Parties' Joint Proposed Limiting Jury Instruction Regarding Evidence of Ryan Goerge's Personal History & Prior Acts filed by Velerie George, Donald George, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 526 Parties' Joint Submission on on Jury Instructions Related to Agency Issues filed by Valerie George, Donald George, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 525 Proposed Revised Joint Jury Questionnaire filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER SETTING FURTHER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 1/27/2011 11:15 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/24/2011. (Attachments: #1 Verdict Form)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 523 TRIAL BRIEF Opposing Amendment of Verdict Form to Separately List Dr. Joseph Matel filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 522 Parties Joint Submission on Jury Instructions for Claim Under Cal Health & Safety Code Section 1317, et seq. filed by Valerie George, Valerie George, Donald George, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 521 TRIAL BRIEF On Allocation of Percentage of Fault filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 520 Letter from Steven L. Wittels re Division of Trial Time. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS' CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS re #488 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #463 is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #466 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #467 is granted as unopposed. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #472 is granted. Trial will begin 2/7/2011 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 516 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING HEARING set for 1/25/2011 re Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims Against County & CMFG Dfts. The Court finds the motion suitable for decision without oral argument. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 515 REQUEST to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors Claims Against County and CFMG Defendants filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 514 Letter from Steven L. Wittels re Valerie and Donald George's individual claims for economic loss. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 513 TRIAL BRIEF on Section 1983 Liability (Policy & Policymakers) filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 512 TRIAL BRIEF on Section 1983 Liability: The Need for a Human Actor filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 511 TRIAL BRIEF on Section 1983 Liability Based on Acts or Decisions of Final Decision Maker filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 510 TRIAL BRIEF on Section 1983 Liability in Response to Sutter's Proposed Jury Instructions Suggesting Need for Individual Violator Under Monell filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 517 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 1/13/2011. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 509 Letter from Sutter Defendants re Proposed Modification of the Verdict Form. (Attachments: #1 Verdict Form)(Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 Filing 508 Proposed Joint Jury Questionnaire filed by Donald George, Valarie Goerge, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 507 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE Withdrawal of Defendant Norick Janian's Motions in Limine re #506 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/7/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 506 STIPULATION and Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Norick Janians Motions in Limine filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 505 REPLY Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #488 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 504 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORM filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 503 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 502 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXHIBIT 11 filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 3, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 30, 2010 Filing 500 Declaration of Gregory G. Spaulding Clarifying Terms of Settlement as Described in re #488 MOTION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS -Declaration of Gregory G. Spaulding Clarifying Terms of Settlement as Described in Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims- filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 499 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #506 . *** STIPULATION AND NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant Norick Janian's Motions in Limine filed by Donald George, Valerie George, Norick Janian, M.D.. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/7/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2010 Filing 498 Disputed & Special Jury Instructions (All Parties) filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Varilie George, Donald George. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 497 Joint Jury Instructions filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Valerie George, Donald George. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 496 REVISED Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Valerie George, Valerie George, Donald George. (Whitehead, Cameron) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 495 Response to re #457 MOTION to Bifurcate Punitive Damages Claim filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 494 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS OF DEFENDANT SUTTER HEALTH AND SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 493 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO WITNESSES OF DEFENDANT SUTTER HEALTH AND SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 492 [Proposed] Order AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS re #488 Submitted by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 491 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #488 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #488 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 490 Declaration of Tajmah Beauchamp in Support of re #488 PAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #488 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 489 Declaration of Valerie George in Support of re #488 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #488 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 488 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIMS AGAINST COUNTY AND CFMG DEFENDANTS filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 487 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #466 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ryan Georges Criminal History and Prior Bad Acts filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #466 ) (Vogel, Barry) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 486 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #487 . *** MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #463 MOTION in Limine to Modify Caption of Verdict Sheet to Exclude References to Former Defendants filed bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #463 ) (Vogel, Barry) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/23/2010 (wv, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 485 Memorandum in Opposition to re #472 MOTION in Limine to Strike Sutter Defendants Untimely and Incomplete Supplemental Disclosures filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Vogel, Barry) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 484 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #463 MOTION in Limine to Modify Caption of Verdict Sheet to Exclude References to Former Defendants filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #463 ) (Vogel, Barry) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 483 OBJECTION to Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibits 1 and 5 filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Vogel, Barry) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 21, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 481 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu HELD on 12/20/2010. Case settled. (Date Filed: 12/20/2010). (Court Reporter none.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 480 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Ryu HELD on 12/17/2010. Settlement discussions continuing until 12/20/2010 at 5 p.m., PST. (Date Filed: 12/17/2010). (Court Reporter None.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 479 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING Jury Trial for 2/7/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DATE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 8, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 477 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Pretrial Deadlines re #475 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 6, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Ryu set for 12/17/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/06/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 475 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 2, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re #474 Order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REFERRING FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 2, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 473 Proposed Jury Instructions by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 472 MOTION in Limine to Strike Sutter Defendants Untimely and Incomplete Supplemental Disclosures filed by Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 471 Proposed Form of Verdict by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 470 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 469 Proposed Voir Dire by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 468 TRIAL BRIEF by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 467 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Testimony From Defendant Janians Purported Expert Economist Mark Cohen filed by Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 466 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ryan Georges Criminal History and Prior Bad Acts filed by Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 465 Exhibit List by Donald George, Valerie George.. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 464 Pretrial Conference Statement by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa JOINT PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 463 MOTION in Limine to Modify Caption of Verdict Sheet to Exclude References to Former Defendants filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 462 Proposed Voir Dire by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 461 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa CACI Jury Instructions. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 460 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa Pre Evidence. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 459 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa Post Evidence. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 458 Exhibit List by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa.. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 457 MOTION to Bifurcate Punitive Damages Claim filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 456 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of the Role of Race and/or Socio-economic Status in the Treatment of Ryan George filed by Norick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 455 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Out of Court Opinions filed by Norick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 454 MOTION in Limine filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 453 MOTION in Limine for Order Restricting Rebuttal Witnesses filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 452 MOTION in Limine Regarding Inadmissibility of Reference to Medical Literature filed by Norick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 451 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinions Not Given at Deposition filed by Norick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 450 TRIAL BRIEF by Norick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 449 Proposed Jury Instructions by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 448 Proposed Form of Verdict by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 447 Witness List by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 446 Proposed Voir Dire by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 445 Exhibit List by Norick Janian.. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 444 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on November 10, 2010, before Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; Telephone number: (859) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2011. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 16, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER re #425 Order on Motion to Strike,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 11, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 441 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference Held. (Date Filed: 11/10/2010). (Recording #FTR: 8:47 - 8:53.) (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 440 Memorandum in Opposition re #427 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Reconsideration re #424 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Dismissal of Wrongful Death and Other State Law Claims against County and Sheriff's Department MOTION for Reconsideration re #424 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Dismissal of Wrongful Death and Other State Law Claims against County and Sheriff's Department filed byCounty of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER re: #437 Request. Signed by Chief agistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/3/2010. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 437 NOTICE filed by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders of Request for Defendant Dagey to Appear by Telephone at Settlement Conference. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL of Defendants Joseph N. Matel, M.D. and Richard Flinders, M.D. re #435 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/29/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 436 Letter from Chester Rogaski, Jr. to Chief Magistrate James Regarding Availability of Client for Settlement Conference Scheduled for November 10, 2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 435 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Joseph R. Matel, M.D. and Richard Flinders, M.D. with [Proposed] Order by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 434 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/24/10, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2011. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 433 NOTICE filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department of WITHDRAWAL OF re #430 EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-9(D) re #427 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Reconsideration & re #424 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Dismissal of Wrongful Death and Other State Law Claims against County and Sheriff's Department MOTION for Reconsideration re #424 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Dismissal of Wrongful Death and Other State Law Claims against County and Sheriff's Department filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 27, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 431 [Proposed] Order re #430 Ex-Parte Application for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION Submitted by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 430 Ex-Parte Application for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 26, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 10/26/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Modified on 11/2/2010 (sgd, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Filing 429 Letter from Gregory G. Spaulding Requesting defendant Sheriff Bill Cogbill be excused from attending Settlement Conference scheduled for November 10, 2010.. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 21, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/10/2010 10:00 AM before Judge James in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 11/10/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/21/10. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 427 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of re #424 Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Wrongful Death and Other State Law Claims against County and Sheriff's Department filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 20, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 10/20/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 10/26/10 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND DENYING COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Terminating re #394 Motion to Strike. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part re #328 Defendant Bill Cogbill's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part re #335 County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER REGARDING FUTURE FILINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 19, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying re #419 Motion to Strike Defendant Cogbills's Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-reply & denying re #420 Motion to Strike Sterling Declaration in Response to Wittels Declaration. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: terminating re #362 Motion for Leave to File & terminating re #395 Ex Parte Application. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 420 MOTION to Strike re #418 Declaration of Terry Sterling in Response to Supplemental Declaration of Steven Wittels filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 419 MOTION to Strike re #417 Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply on Notice of Claim Issues filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 418 DECLARATION of Terry S. Sterling in Response to re #413 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN L. WITTELS RE OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENCE FROM TRACY ALCANTRA, JAMI MCBRIDE AND SARA NAVARRE filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Related document(s) #413 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 417 RESPONSE to re #414 DEFENDANT BILL COGBILL'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ISSUES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' GOVERNMENT CODE CLAIM filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sheriff's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 10/8/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 10/20/10 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 416 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/8/10 at 11:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/4/2010 (sgd, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2010 Filing 415 Letter from Steven L. Wittels re (1) state law claims (2) motions to exclude evidence. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 414 Memorandum of Law in Sur-Reply to re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Issues Regarding Plaintiffs' Government Notice of claim filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Notice of Claim Dec. 18, 2007, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Amended Notice of Claim Feb. 20, 2008)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 413 Supplemental DECLARATION of Steven L. Wittels in Opposition to re #383 Objection to Cty Defts Motion to Strike and Exclude Evidence filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #383 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 412 RESPONSE to re #408 Submission of Recent Judicial Decision filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Katherine Leong for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice re #409 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 408 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Dunn v. Castro, 2010 WL 3547637 (9th Cir. 2010) filed byBill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Related document(s) #335 , #328 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 410 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 9/24/2010 re the Sonoma County Defendants and Defendant Bill Cogbill's Motions for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #328 #335 . (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 409 APPLICATION of Attorney Katherine Leong for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice - [Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611050981] filed by Plaintiffs Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George & Valerie George. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Appear Telephonically re #404 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/23/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 406 AMENDED NOTICE of Errata REGARDING #405 DECLARATION EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SUTTER DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND FOR APPROVAL TO SUPPLEMENT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION WITH DISCHARGE POLICY; DECLARATION OF LARRY THORNTON IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 405 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #403 Declaration Exhibits in Support of REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SUTTER DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND FOR APPROVAL TO SUPPLEMENT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION WITH DISCHARGE POLICY; DECLARATION OF LARRY THORNTON IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 404 REQUEST to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Donald George, Valerie George. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2010 10:00 AM. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 403 Declaration of Larry Thornton in Support of re #401 Reply to re #400 Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #395 Sutter Defendants' Ex- Parte Application for Administrative Relief and Approval to Supplement Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Policy filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #401 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 402 Declaration of Larry Thornton in Support of re #401 Reply to re #400 Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #395 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief and Approval to Supplement Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Policy filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #401 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 401 Reply to re #400 Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #395 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief and for Approval to Supplement Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Planning Policy filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 400 Memorandum in Opposition to re #395 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief and for Approval to Supplement Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Planning Policy Ex Parte Application re #362 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Administrative Relief and for Approval to Supplement Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Planning Policy filed byDonald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven L. Wittels, #2 Proposed Order)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 399 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Sonoma County Defendants and Bill Cogbill's Motions for Summary Judgment. Hearing set for 9/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 398 Memorandum in Opposition re #394 MOTION to Strike #390 Memorandum in Opposition, #391 Memorandum in Opposition, #392 Memorandum in Opposition, #393 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,, #388 Memorandum in Opposition, #387 Memorandum in Opposition, #389 Memorandum in Oppositio MOTION to Strike #390 Memorandum in Opposition, #391 Memorandum in Opposition, #392 Memorandum in Opposition, #393 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,, #388 Memorandum in Opposition, #387 Memorandum in Opposition, #389 Memorandum in Oppositio filed byDonald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 397 [Proposed] Order Granting re #395 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief and for Approval to Supplement Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Planning Policy Submitted by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 396 Declaration of Larry Thornton in Support of re #395 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief and for Approval to Supplement Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Planning Policy filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #395 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 395 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief and for Approval to Supplement Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Reconsideration with Discharge Planning Policy; Declaration of Larry Thornton; [Proposed] Order filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 394 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Five Memoranda of Law & Declaration of Steven Wittels filed in re #390 Memorandum in Opposition, re #391 Memorandum in Opposition, re #392 Memorandum in Opposition, re #393 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, re #388 Memorandum in Opposition, re #387 Memorandum in Opposition, re #389 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 393 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #392 Opposition to re #379 Cty Defts Motions to Exclude and Strike Pltfs' Summary Judgment Evidence (Docs. 379-383) filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Vasquez Report, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Caruso Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. C- Shohet Report, #4 Exhibit Ex. D- Richard Johnson Report, #5 Exhibit Ex. E- Shohet CV, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Cty Defts' Initial Disclosures, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Ruiz Report, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Disclosures, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Vasquez Reports in Baker Case, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Bikle Report, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - Michael Okler Dec. 8-20-10, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - Valerie George Typed Statement, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - Excerpts from Pltfs' Rog Reponses, #14 Exhibit Ex. N - Valerie and Donald George Dep. Excerpts)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 392 Memorandum in Opposition to re #379 County Defendants' Motion to Exclude and Strike Civil Grand Jury Reports, Responses, and Related Testimony filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 391 Memorandum in Opposition to re #383 County Defendants' Motion to Strike and Exclude "Undisclosed" Witnesses and Evidence filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 390 Memorandum in Opposition to re: #380 Motion to Exclude and Strike Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Amand Ruiz, M.D. filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 389 Memorandum in Opposition to re: #381 Motion to Exclude and Strike Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Shohet, M.D. (Corrected) filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 388 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #389 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re: #381 Motion to Exclude and Strike Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Shohet, M.D. filed byDonald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 387 Memorandum in Opposition to re: #382 Motion to Exclude and Strike Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Daniel B. Vasquez filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 1, 2010 Filing 386 Reply Memorandum in Support of re #362 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Section 1983 Claims against the Sutter Defendants filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 Filing 385 STIPULATION & [Proposed] Order Dropping Defendants Sutter Health & Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa's re #348 MOTION to Augment Expert Witness Disclosure filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO THE COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 31, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 383 OBJECTIONS to re #301 Memorandum in Opposition, #298 Memorandum in Opposition, MOTION TO STRIKE PREVIOUSLY UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES AND DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 382 OBJECTIONS to re #301 Memorandum in Opposition, #298 Memorandum in Opposition, AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL B. VASQUEZ SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 381 OBJECTIONS to re #301 Memorandum in Opposition, #298 Memorandum in Opposition, AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE TESTIMONY OF STEPHEN SHOHET, M.D. SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS BY COUNTY OF SONOMA/SONOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND BILL COGBILL FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 380 OBJECTIONS to re #360 Memorandum in Opposition, #357 Memorandum in Opposition AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING CARE PROVIDED BY SONOMA COUNTY MENTAL HEALTH, AND TESTIMONY OF AMANDA RUIZ, M.D. SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS BY COUNTY OF SONOMA/SONOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND BILL COGBILL FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 379 OBJECTIONS to re #360 Memorandum in Opposition, #357 Memorandum in Opposition AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE SONOMA COUNTY GRAND JURY REPORTS, RESPONSES THERETO AND TESTIMONY PERTAINING TO THEM SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS BY COUNTY OF SONOMA/SONOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND BILL COGBILL FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 378 Declaration of Mike Toby in Support of re #376 & re #375 Reply to Oppositions filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Related document(s) #376 , #375 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 377 Declaration of Terry S. Sterling in Support of re #376 & re #375 Reply to Oppositions filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(Related document(s) #376 , #375 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 376 Reply to re #360 Opposition to re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bill Cogbill. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 375 Reply to re #357 Opposition to re #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re #369 Ex-Parte Application. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 373 DECLARATION of Larry Thornton in Support of re #372 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #372 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 372 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #362 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #362 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 371 RESPONSE to re #369 Ex-Parte Application OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF SONOMA, SONOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND BILL COGBILL FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND APPROVAL TO FILE MEMORANDA OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES IN LENGTH; DECLARATION OF TERRY S Response and Clarification filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 370 Memorandum in Opposition to Cty Defts' Objections to Pltfs' S.J. Opp. Memoranda and Motion for Sanctions (re Doc. 364) filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Ex A - Email chain 7/23/2010, #(2) Exhibit Ex. B - Email chain 8/16-17/2010)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 369 Ex-Parte Application OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF SONOMA, SONOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND BILL COGBILL FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND APPROVAL TO FILE MEMORANDA OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES IN LENGTH; DECLARATION OF TERRY S. STERLING; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 09:00 AM. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 368 Memorandum in Opposition re #348 MOTION for Disclosure Agument Expert Witness Disclosure filed byTajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven L. Wittels, #2 Exhibit Ex, A- Sutter Expert Disclosures 2/2/10, #3 Exhibit Ex. B- Matel-Flinders Expert Disclosures- 2-2-10, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Settlement Agreement- 3-23-10, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Expert Report of Jonathan French)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER PERMITTING RESPONSE UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-9(d) re #362 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 25, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 366 Declaration of Marc N. Zimmerman in Support of #365 Memorandum in Opposition to motion by Defendants Sutter Health and Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa to Augment Expert Witness Disclosure filed byRichard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Related document(s) #365 ) (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 365 Memorandum in Opposition re #348 MOTION for Disclosure Agument Expert Witness Disclosure filed byRichard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 364 OBJECTIONS to re #360 Memorandum in Opposition, #357 Memorandum in Opposition OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDA IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO DEFENDANT BILL COGBILL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES; DECLARATION OF TERRY S. STERLING by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 363 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #362 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #362 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 362 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Section 1983 Claims Against the Sutter Defendants filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 361 DECLARATION of Steven L. Wittels in Opposition to re #335 Defendant Bill Cogbill's MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (CORRECTED) filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #335 , #328 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 360 Memorandum in Opposition to re #328 Defendant Bill Cogbill's MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 359 DECLARATION of Tracy Alcantra in Opposition to re #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #335 , #328 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2010
August 20, 2010 Filing 358 DECLARATION of Steven L. Wittels in Opposition to re #335 County Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit, #114 Exhibit, #115 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #335 , #328 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 357 Memorandum in Opposition to re #335 County Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re #341 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 355 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING the 8/12/2010 hearing re Defendant Matel and Flinders' Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement #341 . Court finds motion suitable for decision without oral argument. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re #353 Application to Appear by Telephone. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 353 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing on Defendants Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting in Part & Denying in Part re #269 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part & Denying in Part re #281 Motion for Summary Judgment. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 351 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #341 MOTION for Determination of Good Faith Settlement by Dr. Matel & Dr. Flinders filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 350 [Proposed] Order Granting re #348 MOTION to Augment Expert Witness Disclosure Submitted by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 349 Declaration of Larry Thornton in Support of re #348 MOTION to Augment Expert Witness Disclosure filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #348 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 348 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Augment Expert Witness Disclosure; MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 347 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #341 Matel & Flinders Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 346 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #341 Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 345 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #341 Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 344 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Response to re #341 Defendant Matels & Flinders' Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 343 Declaration of Joanna L. Storey in Support of re #341 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - Part Two to re #342 Declaration filed by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Related document(s) #342 ) (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 342 Declaration of Joanna L. Storey in Support of re #341 MOTION for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - Part One filed by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 341 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 340 [Proposed] Order Granting re #335 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Submitted by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 339 [Proposed] Order Granting re #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment Submitted by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 338 Declaration of Terry S. Sterling in Support of re #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Related document(s) #335 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 337 Declaration of Lt. Michael Toby in Support of re #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-T)(Related document(s) #335 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 336 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of re #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Related document(s) #335 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 335 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 334 [Proposed] Order Granting re #328 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Submitted by Bill Cogbill. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 333 [Proposed] Order Granting re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment Submitted by Bill Cogbill. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 332 Declaration of Terry S. Sterling in Support of re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bill Cogbill. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-H)(Related document(s) #328 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 STIPULATION & ORDER AS MODIFIED re #326 Stipulation. Motion to be filed by July 27, 2010. Opposition due by noon on August 2, 2010. Reply due on August 3 & Hearing scheduled for August 11, 2010 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 26, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 330 Declaration of Lt. Michael Toby in Support of re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bill Cogbill. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-T)(Related document(s) #328 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 329 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bill Cogbill. (Related document(s) #328 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 328 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment (Fed.R.Civ.Pro.Rule 56) filed by Bill Cogbill. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 STIPULATION & ORDER Allowing Defendants County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sheriff's Department & Bill Cogbill to File Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Excess of 25 Pages in Length re #325 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/26/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 326 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Submitted by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 325 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF SONOMA, SONOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND BILL COGBILL TO FILE MEMORANDA OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGES IN LENGTH by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPROMISE OF MINORS' CLAIMS AND APPOINTING VALERIE GEORGE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM re #307 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/20/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 Filing 323 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 7/20/2010 re Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims and Appointing Valerie George as Guradian ad Litem to Appoint Guardian ad Litem #307 . (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re #321 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 321 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 320 RESPONSE to re #316 Reply to re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian Ad Litem filed by Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 319 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 7/13/2010 re Sutter Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication #269 and Motion for Summary Judgment #281 filed by Defendant Norick Janian. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 318 Response to re #316 Defendants Sutter Health & Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa to re #307 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian Ad Litem filed by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (French, Bryant) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 317 DECLARATION of Larry Thornton in Support of re #316 Reply to #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian Ad Litem filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #307 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 316 Reply to re #307 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian Ad Litem filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 ***Set/Reset Deadlines as to re #307 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem MOTION for Settlement Approval of Minor's Compromise. Motion Hearing re-set for 7/20/2010 at 9:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE re #314 Stipulation filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 8, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 314 STIPULATION & [Proposed] Order Re Shortening Time for Hearing on re #307 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem Submitted by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 313 [Proposed] Order re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem MOTION for Settlement - Approval of Minor's Compromise Submitted by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 312 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #307 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 311 Declaration of Tajmah Beauchamp in Support of re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #307 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 310 Declaration of Valerie George in Support of re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizint Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #307 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 309 Declaration of Tajmah Beauchamp in Support of re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie Geroge as Guardian ad Litem filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #307 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 308 Declaration of Valerie George in Support of re #307 MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #307 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 307 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minors' Claims & Appointing Valerie George as Guardian ad Litem filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 29, 2010 Filing 306 NOTICE OF ERRATA Regarding Page Citations for Exhibit A to Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication, as set forth in Defendants' Reply to Opposition re #274 Exhibits, re #270 Brief, re #271 Declaration in Support, re #303 Declaration in Opposition, re #302 Reply to Opposition. filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION FOR PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO SUTTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 25, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 304 Reply to re #301 Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #281 Defendant Norick Janian, M.D.'s MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment or Adjudication filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 303 DECLARATION of Larry Thornton in Support of re #302 Reply to re #291 Opposition to re #269 Motion for Summary Judgment or for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #302 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 302 Reply to re #291 Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #269 Sutter Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 12, 2010 Filing 301 Memorandum in Opposition to re #281 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment or Adjudication filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/12/2010)
June 12, 2010 Filing 300 DECLARATION of Steven L. Wittels in Opposition to re #281 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment or Adjudication filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #281 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/12/2010)
June 12, 2010 Filing 299 DECLARATION of Steven L. Wittels in Opposition to re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed byTajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Errata, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #269 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/12/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 298 Memorandum in Opposition to re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #(1) Supplement Body of Brief, #(2) Proposed Order Admin Memo for Equivalent Pg Limit of 55 Pgs)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 297 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 4/16/2010 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance of Briefing and Hearing Schedule #288 . Hearing re Motions for Summary Judgment set for 7/13/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2010 02:00 PM. (FTR 12:18pm-12:34pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 ***Deadlines Terminated. re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health, re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norick Janian, Set/Reset Deadlines as to re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment.Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2010 at 9:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
April 14, 2010 Filing 296 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norick Janian re #294 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Continuance (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 295 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norick Janian re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 294 Memorandum in Opposition to re #288 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed byNorick Janian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 293 [Proposed] Order Granting in Part & Denying in Part re #288 Administrative Motion (A) to Withdraw Docket Number 283 & (B) for Continuance of the Briefing & Hearing Schedule for (1) Defendant Hospital & Sutter Health's (2) Defendant Janian's Motion for Summary Judgment. Submitted by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 292 DECLARATION of Larry Thornton in Support of re #291 Opposition to re #288 MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) filed bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 291 Memorandum in Opposition to re #288 MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) filed bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 290 [Proposed] Order re #288 MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 289 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of re #288 MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) MOTION to Withdraw #283 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) filed byTajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #288 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 288 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (A) to Withdraw Docket Number #283 Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief, and for Continuance of the Briefing & Hearing Schedule for (1) Defendant Hospital & Sutter Health's re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for (1) Withdrawal of Doc 283 and (2) Adjournment of Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions Filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 287 [Proposed] Order Denying #283 Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief Submitted by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 286 AFFIDAVIT in Support of re #285 Opposition to re #283 Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief filed bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 285 Memorandum in Opposition to re #283 Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief Filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 8, 2010 ***Deadlines Terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: All Expert Discovery due 7/30/2010. Jury Trial set for 1/24/2011 & the Last Day for Hearing Dispositive Motions shall be 9/21/2010 at 9:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Pretrial Case Management Deadlines re #282 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 8, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 283 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Briefing and Hearing Schedule for the Sutter Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Relief filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Continuance)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/8/2010) Modified on 4/9/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2010 Filing 282 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Pretrial Case Management Deadlines by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 281 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment or Adjudication; MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof. Filed by Defendant Norick Janian, M.D.. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit, #(2) Exhibit, #(3) Proposed Order)(Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 280 NOTICE of Errata Regarding Deposition Exhibits & Declaration of Larry Thornton in Support re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #272 Exhibits, #273 Exhibits, #274 Exhibits, #270 Brief, #271 Declaration in Support, #275 Exhibits, Reporter's Certifications by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 STIPULATION & ORDER RE PAGE LIMIT AS MODIFIED re #277 . Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/19/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ** PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 279 ** STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PAGE LIMIT AS MODIFIED #277 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/19/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 277 STIPULATION for Page Limit Re Motion for Summary Judgment; [Proposed] Order by Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 276 Proposed Order Granting re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 275 EXHIBITS to the re #271 Declaration in Support of re #269 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication, Exhibit O Part 1 filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O Part 2, #2 Exhibit O Part 3, #3 Exhibit O Part 4, #4 Exhibit O Part 5)(Related document(s) #272 , #273 , #274 , #271 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 274 EXHIBITS to the re #271 Declaration in Support of re #269 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication, Exhibit A Part 1 filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 2, #2 Exhibit A Part 3, #3 Exhibit A Part 4)(Related document(s) #272 , #273 , #271 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 273 EXHIBITS to the re #271 Declaration in Support of re #269 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #272 , #271 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 272 EXHIBITS C to re #271 Declaration in Support of re #269 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #271 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 271 Declaration of Larry Thornton in Support of re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #269 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support of re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Related document(s) #269 ) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 269 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER re #267 Ex-Parte Application to File Exceed Page Length re Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication AS MODIFIED Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/5/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 267 Ex-Parte Application for Administrative Relief & Approval to File a Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Summary Adjudication, in Excess of 25 Pages in Length; Declaration of Larry Thornton & [Proposed] Order Filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re #264 Stipulation filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 8, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #218 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 3, 2010 Filing 264 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/1/2010 Granting in part & Denying in part re #220 Motion to Compel; Granting in part & Denying in part re #234 Motion to Quash. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 28, 2010 Filing 262 Proposed Order re #220 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for, #234 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Depositions of Dr. R. Ward Hagar, Stephen Passalacqua, and Robert La Forge; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 27, 2010 Filing 261 Proposed Order re #218 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Plaintiff Estate's Ninth Cause of Action by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 260 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 1/26/2010 re Sutter Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Plaintiff Estate's Ninth Cause of Action. (Court Reporter: Kelly Bryce) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 258 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Marc Litton (Litton, Thomas) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dropping re #239 Defendants Richard Flinders, M.D.'s & Joseph Matel, M.D.'s Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice & re #256 Stipulation Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 13, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 12, 2010 Filing 259 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 1/12/2010 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiff's of Motion to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants #220 and Defendants' Motion to Quash deposition subpoenas. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Filing 256 STIPULATION re #239 MOTION to Dismiss and Proposed Order by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 11, 2010 Filing 255 Reply to Opposition re #218 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Plaintiff Estate's Ninth Cause of Action Filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 254 Letter from Steven L. Wittels Re County Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoenas. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 253 Memorandum in Opposition to re #218 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Plaintiff Estate's Ninth Cause of Action Filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 252 Memorandum in Opposition to re #239 MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 28, 2009 Filing 251 Declaration of DIANA E. GOMEZ in Support of #249 Reply Memorandum,,,, SURREPLY FILED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH filed byBill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #249 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 250 Declaration of TERRY S. STERLING in Support of #249 Reply Memorandum,,,, SURREPLY FILED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH filed byBill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Related document(s) #249 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 249 Reply Memorandum re #220 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for, #234 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Depositions of Dr. R. Ward Hagar, Stephen Passalacqua, and Robert La Forge; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof SURREPLY OF COUNTY DEFENDANTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH filed byBill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 24, 2009 Filing 248 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Defendants Matel and Flinders' Motion to Dismiss to 02:00 PM on 1/26/2010 before Judge Laporte in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 247 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of re #220 Plaintiffs' motion to compel non-party discovery filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1- Ltr from DA 11-13-09, #2 Exhibit Ex 2- Proofs of service for DA deposition subpoenas)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 246 NOTICE of Change of Address by Chester Andrew Rogaski, Jr (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 245 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Tajmah Beauchamp's Individual Claims CORRECTION OF DOCKET #244 by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 244 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #245 . *** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Tajmah Beauchamp's Individual Claims by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/18/2009) Modified on 12/21/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2009 Filing 243 Proposed Order re #239 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 242 Declaration of Joseph Matel, M.D. in Support of #239 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRichard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Related document(s) #239 ) (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 241 Declaration of Richard Flinders, M.D. in Support of #239 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRichard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Related document(s) #239 ) (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 240 Request for Judicial Notice re #239 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRichard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Related document(s) #239 ) (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DISTRICT ATTORNEY STEPHEN PASSALAQUA, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT LAFORGE AND DR. R. WARD HAGAR AND FINDING THE REMAINDER OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL UNTIMELY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 11, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 237 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING the Sutter Defendants' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas #234 to 02:00 PM on 1/12/2010 in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 8, 2009 Filing 236 Proposed Order re #234 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Depositions of Dr. R. Ward Hagar, Stephen Passalacqua, and Robert La Forge; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 8, 2009 Filing 235 Declaration of Terry S. Sterling in Support of #234 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Depositions of Dr. R. Ward Hagar, Stephen Passalacqua, and Robert La Forge; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byBill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #234 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 8, 2009 Filing 234 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Depositions of Dr. R. Ward Hagar, Stephen Passalacqua, and Robert La Forge; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE re #229 Letter filed by Joseph N. Matel, Richard Flinders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 3, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Filing 232 Letter from Plaintiffs to the Court Demonstrating Good Cause for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 231 Letter from Defendants re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 230 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Sutter Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #218 to 02:00 PM on 1/26/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 229 Letter from Marc N. Zimmerman, Esq. joint defense response to Mr. Wittels' November 25, 2009 letter concerning length of trial. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #227 Stipulation, filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 30, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 24, 2009 Filing 227 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS TIME TO RESPOND SUTTER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ESTATES NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/18/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 225 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR 11:17am - 11:31am) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 Filing 224 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (corrected version) filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Filing 223 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Filing 222 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Order Shortening Time filed byBill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 221 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of #220 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for filed byDonald George, Valerie George. (Related document(s) #220 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 220 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memo in Support of Motion (1) to Compel Depositions, and (2) to Compel Document Production from Sonoma County Defendants and CFMG Defendants, and (3) to Extend the written Discovery Period for the Limited Purpose of Allowing This Motion to Compel filed by Donald George, Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #217 Motion to Appear by Telephone (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 218 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Plaintiff Estate's Ninth Cause of Action filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of Scott H. Cavanaugh)(Cavanaugh, Scott) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 217 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #215 Stipulation filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 3, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 215 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 214 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re First Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial CORRECTION OF DOCKET #213 . by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 213 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #214 . *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order re First Ammended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial by Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/30/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME FOR DEFENDANT LUDERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 29, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #210 Motion to Appear by Telephone (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 210 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' OCTOBER 15, 2009 LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 21, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #207 Motion to Appear by Telephone (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 207 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 206 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANT EDWARD W. HARD, JR., M.D. by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER re #204 Stipulation, filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 13, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 204 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION OF MEDIATOR AND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION, AND REMOVING CASE FROM THE COURT'S ADR PROGRAM AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
September 25, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman, ADR Program Director, on 9/24/09. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 203 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, September 24, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time (1:00 p.m. Eastern time). The ADR Unit will initiate the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STIPULATION AND ORDER [AS MODIFIED] CONTINUING Further Case Management Conference to 11/17/2009 10:00 AM re #201 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/24/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 201 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Of All Parties to Continue CMC filed by Valerie George. (Litton, Thomas) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 200 NOTICE by Edward W. Hard of Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Permitted to Appear by Telephone at the Further Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Request for Lead Counsel to Appear by Telephone)(Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 199 NOTICE by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders of Request for Lead Counsel to Appear by Telephone (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request for Lead Counsel to Appear by Telephone)(Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING REQUESTS for Telephonic Appearance re #193 #195 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/21/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re #195 Notice (Other) Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Appearing at Initial Case Management Conference (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 196 Proposed Order re #195 Notice (Other) Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Appearing at Initial Case Management Conference by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 195 NOTICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Appearing at Initial Case Management Conference (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 194 Proposed Order re #193 Letter, REQUEST for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Appearing at Further Case Management Conference and to Allow Associate/Co-Trial Counsel to Appear by Telephone by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 193 Letter from counsel for County of Sonoma defendants re: REQUEST for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Appearing at Further Case Management Conference and to Allow Associate/Co-Trial Counsel to Appear by Telephone. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 18, 2009 Filing 192 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (UPDATED) filed by County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte finding as moot #180 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 190 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 8/4/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Angus Matheson, M.D. #180 . (Court Reporter Debra Pas) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #188 Motion to Appear by Telephone (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 12:00 p.m. on 8/4/09. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 188 MOTION to Appear by Telephone AT HEARING ON DEFENDANT ANGUS MATHESON, M.D.S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Valerie George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 28, 2009 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angus Matheson, M.D. re: Consent to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 Filing 186 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Angus Matheson, M.D... (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 185 Reply to re #184 Opposition to re #180 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Angus Matheson, M.D.. (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 184 Memorandum in Opposition re #180 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Matheson filed byValerie George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Litton, Thomas) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angus Matheson, M.D. re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 182 Memorandum in Opposition to re #181 Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue filed byAngus Matheson, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 13, 2009 Filing 181 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Matheson's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and [Proposed] Order filed by Valerie George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Litton, Thomas) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
June 23, 2009 Filing 180 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Angus Matheson, M.D.. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 6/23/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angus Matheson, M.D. (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 178 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAngus Matheson, M.D.. (Goldman, Ronald) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 177 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Service waived by Angus Matheson, M.D. waiver sent on 3/24/2009, answer due 5/26/2009. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 176 Richard Flinders, M.D.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byRichard Flinders. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 175 Joseph R. Matel, M.D.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byJoseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE Defendants Richard Flinders, M.D.'s and Joseph N. Matel, M.D.'s Motion to Dismiss and Norick Janian, M.D.'s Motion to Join. Motions Withdrawn. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/8/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 7, 2009 Filing 173 STIPULATION re #167 MOTION for Joinder in Flinders and Matel Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, #161 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, M.D. and Joseph R. Matel, M.D., and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages CORRECTION TO DOCKET #160 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, M.D. and Joseph R. Matel, M.D., and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages CORRECTION TO DOCKET #160 by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 25, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motions to Dismiss #161 #167 . Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2009 09:00 AM. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Norick Janian, M.D.'s Motion to Joint re #171 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/25/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 171 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT FLINDERS AND MATEL'S MOTION TO DIMISS AND DEFENDANT JANIAN'S MOTION TO JOIN by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 169 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Steven Lance Wittels (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 170 SUMMONS on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Angus Matheson, M.D..(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 168 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third Amended) byEdward W. Hard. (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 167 MOTION for Joinder in Flinders and Matel Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Norick Janian. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING IN PART Defendants Janian's, Matel's and Flinders's Motions to Dismiss #64 #102 #108 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 165 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint bySonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 164 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third) byNorick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 163 Proposed Order Granting re #161 Motion to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, M.D. and Joseph R. Matel, M.D., and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages by Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 162 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #161 Motion to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, M.D. and Joseph R. Matel, M.D., and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages Filed by Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, M.D. and Joseph R. Matel, M.D., and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages CORRECTION TO DOCKET #160 Filed by Joseph N. Matel. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 160 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #161 . *** Ninth MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Flinders, M.D. and Joseph R. Matel, M.D., and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages filed by Joseph N. Matel. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/6/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re #158 Answer to Amended Complaint (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 158 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 157 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byJames Luders. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 156 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMichael E. Dagey. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 155 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCalifornia Forensic Medical Group, Inc.. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 154 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Edward W. Hard, Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel, Norick Janian. Filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 153 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-10-09, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2009. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 152 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Case referred for mediation to occur no later than 12/2009. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2009 10:00 AM. All non-expert written discovery shall be completed by 9/30/2009. Depositions shall be completed by 10/30/2009. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 1/15/2010. Last day for hearing dispositive motions 3/16/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2010 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/13/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 150 Minute Entry: Hearing re Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #64 #102 #108 and Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/10/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case REFERRED for mediation to occur by 12/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2009 10:00 AM. Last day to hear dispositive motions 3/16/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2010 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 149 *** PLEASE DISREGARD, ISSUED IN ERROR *** CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Defendants James Luder M.D., Mike Dagey R.N., and California Forensic Medical Group's Motion to Dismiss #126 . Hearing reset for 3/10/2009 09:00 AM. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 Filing 148 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Answer to Second Amended Complaint) byEdward W. Hard. (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING Request re #141 filed by Edward W. Hard. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/6/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING Request #139 filed by Joseph N. Matel. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/6/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 145 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byJames Luders. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 144 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMichael E. Dagey. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 143 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCalifornia Forensic Medical Group, Inc.. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders re #126 MOTION to Dismiss is withdrawn (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE by Edward W. Hard Re: Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Appearing at Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 140 Proposed Order Granting Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused From Appearing at Case Management Conference by Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE by Joseph N. Matel Re: Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused From Appearing at Case Management Conference (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 4, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 2/4/09. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #134 Motion to Appear by Telephone (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re #128 Letter filed by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 4, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re #131 Letter filed by Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sherrif's Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 4, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 135 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 134 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 133 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Edward W. Hard, Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel, Norick Janian. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 132 Proposed Order re #131 Letter Request for Lead Trial Counsel to Be Excused from Appearing at Initial Case Management Conference by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 131 Letter from Request for Lead Trial Counsel to Be Excused from Appearing At Initial Case Management Conference. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re #129 Proposed Order, #128 Letter re: requesting permission for lead trial counsel to be excused from appearing at Initial CMC (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 129 Proposed Order re #128 Letter requesting permission for lead trial counsel to be excused from attending Initial CMC by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 128 Letter from Counsel for Defs. Sutter Health & Sutter Med Ctr Santa Rosa re REQUEST for lead counsel to be excused from attending Initial CMC. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders re #126 MOTION to Dismiss certificate of service on non-ECF parties (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re #124 Answer to Amended Complaint (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 124 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 123 Reply to re #117 Opposition to re #108 Motion to Dismiss/Strike filed by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 122 Reply Brief re #102 Motions to Dismiss and Strike filed by Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George re #117 Memorandum in Opposition (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George re #116 Memorandum in Opposition, (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George re #115 Memorandum in Opposition, (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 118 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed byEdward W. Hard. (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled for 1/21/09 has been rescheduled to 1/30/09 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 2/4/09 at 10:00 a.m. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 117 Memorandum in Opposition re #108 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike filed byTajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, and Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition re #102 MOTION to Dismiss the 1st, 3rd, 5th, 14th, 16th, 18th & 19th Causes of Action and All Claims Mady by Tajmah Beuachamp Individually; Richard Flinders, M.D.'s Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages; Memo of Points & Authorities filed byTajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, and Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Filing 115 Memorandum in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss The 1st, 3rd, 5th, 14th, 16th, 18th & 19th Causes of Action and all Claims Made by Tajmah Beauchamp individually filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 114 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint against Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Edward W. Hard, Richard Flinders, Joseph N. Matel, Norick Janian. Filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Litton, Thomas) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 113 Proposed Order re #112 MOTION to Dismiss 1st, 3rd, 5th, 12th, 13th, 16th and 18th Causes of Action, all claims by Tajmah Beauchamp as an individual MOTION to Strike All Punitive Damages by Edward W. Hard. (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss 1st, 3rd, 5th, 12th, 13th, 16th and 18th Causes of Action, all claims by Tajmah Beauchamp as an individual, MOTION to Strike All Punitive Damages filed by Edward W. Hard. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting re #106 Stipulation Extending Time To Respond of Defendant Norick Janian, M.D. filed by Norick Janian. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/23/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #30 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Dismiss; denying #31 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part #34 Motion to Dismiss; granting #54 Motion ; finding as moot #60 Motion (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 109 Proposed Order by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike filed by Norick Janian. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 107 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Norick Janian.. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Norick Janian. (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 105 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Flinders.. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 104 Proposed Order re #102 MOTION to Dismiss the 1st, 3rd, 5th, 14th, 16th, 18th & 19th Causes of Action and All Claims Mady by Tajmah Beuachamp Individually; Richard Flinders, M.D.'s Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages; Memo of Points & Authorities by Richard Flinders. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Chester Andrew Rogaski, Jr (Rogaski, Chester) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss the 1st, 3rd, 5th, 14th, 16th, 18th & 19th Causes of Action and All Claims Mady by Tajmah Beuachamp Individually; Richard Flinders, M.D.'s Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages; Memo of Points & Authorities filed by Richard Flinders. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 101 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 12/16/2008 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #30 #31 #34 and Plaintiffs' Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code sec. 945.4 #60 . Case Management Conference continued to 2/10/2009 09:00 AM. Defendant Joseph M. Mattel's Motion to Dismiss is reset for 2/10/2009 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused re #98 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/15/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 12/15/08. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #93 Proposed Order filed by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 12, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 98 Proposed Order re #97 Letter Request For Lead Trial Counsel To Be Excused From Appearing At Initial Case Management Conference by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 97 Letter from Lead Trial Counsel Request for Lead Trial Counsel To Be Excused From Appearing At The Initial Case Management Conference. (Spaulding, Gregory) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 96 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edward W. Hard.. (Meagher, Daniel) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward W. Hard (Meagher, Daniel) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE Defendant Edward W. Hard. M.D.'s Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re #91 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/12/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 93 Proposed Order re #92 Letter Requesting Permission for Lead Trial Counsel to be excused from attending Initial CMC by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 92 Letter from Lead Trial Counsel, Barry Vogel Requesting to be Excused from Attending Initial CMC. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 8:30 a.m. Pacific time on 12/15/08. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been reset to 4:30 p.m. on 12/15/08. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 91 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DEFENDANT EDWARD W. HARD, M.D.'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George, Edward W. Hard. (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol C. Sleeth and Daniel J. Meagher (Sleeth, Carol) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 89 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 12/15/08 at 10:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 11, 2008 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 1:30 p.m. on 12/15/08. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 88 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #84 Stipulation filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 8, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of Counsel ADR Certification by Party and Counsel by Joanna Lee Storey on behalf of Joseph N. Matel (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George of EDWARD W. HARD, M.D. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 84 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DEFENDANT MATEL'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to RICHARD FLINDERS, M.D. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to NORICK JANIAN, M.D. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to JOSEPH N. MATEL (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 80 Reply to Opposition re #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, #60 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code 945.4 filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons & Jury Trial Demanded Filed by Joseph N. Matel, M.D.. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 78 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph N. Matel.. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re #73 Stipulation, filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/26/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 76 Reply to Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Forensic Medical Group, Inc., James Luders. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 75 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 74 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 73 STIPULATION re #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, #60 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code 945.4 Stipulation Extending Plfts Time to File Reply Papers Until 12/5/08 by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 72 Reply to Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed bySonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 71 Memorandum in Opposition re #60 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code 945.4 filed bySonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re #69 Reply to Opposition re Sutter defendants' Mtn to Dismiss (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 69 AMENDED Reply to re #63 Opposition to defendants' Motion to Dismiss (amended as to time of hearing only) Filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re Reply to Opp to Sutter defendants' Mtn to Dismiss (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 67 Reply to re #63 Opposition to defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 66 Memorandum in Opposition re #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely filed bySonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 65 Proposed Order re #64 MOTION to Dismiss The 1st, 3rd, 5th, 14th, 16th, 18th & 19th Causes of Action and all Claims Made by Tajmah Beauchamp individually by Joseph N. Matel. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss The 1st, 3rd, 5th, 14th, 16th, 18th & 19th Causes of Action and all Claims Made by Tajmah Beauchamp individually filed by Joseph N. Matel. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Storey, Joanna) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #30 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #62 filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 62 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #63 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/14/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Filing 61 Memorandum in Opposition re #31 First MOTION to Dismiss 1st, 3rd, 5th & 16th Causes of ActionFirst MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive DamagesFirst MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive Damages filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 60 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code 945.4 filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George re #56 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,, #57 Brief, #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, #55 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code sec. 945.4 (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George re #56 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,, #57 Brief, #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, #55 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code sec. 945.4 (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 57 Brief re #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, #55 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code sec. 945.4 filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Related document(s) #54 , #55 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 56 Declaration of Steven L. Wittels in Support of #54 MOTION Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, #55 MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code sec. 945.4 filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- 1st Amended Cmplt, #2 Exhibit Ex 2- Autopsy Report, #3 Exhibit Ex 3- Dec. 2007 Claim Form, #4 Exhibit Ex 4- Feb 2008 amended claim form, #5 Exhibit Ex 5- July 2007 Ltrs of concern, #6 Exhibit Ex 6- 7/10/07 newspaper article, #7 Exhibit Ex.7 7/11/07 Ltr to Coroner, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Sonoma County Coroner's autopsy, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Sonoma County Sheriff Dept re death certificate, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 Ltr to Sonoma County DA, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 7/22/07 Article, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 Ltr to Sheriff for RG records, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 9-30-07 Article, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 11-5-07 ltr to Sonoma County Jail medical contractor re records, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 12-7-07 Article, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 Petition for Ltrs of Admin and certified letters of admin, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 1-7-8 Ltr to Sonoma County DA re investigation, #18 Exhibit Ex.18 3-17-08 ltr from Sonoma County DA re interviews with famliy, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19-1 Valerie George rejection 4-4-08, #20 Exhibit Ex. 19-2 Estate Untimely Claim, #21 Exhibit Ex. 19-3 Valerie George and Children Untimely Claim, #22 Exhibit Ex. 19-4 Tajmah Beauchamp Untimely Claim 4-4-08, #23 Exhibit Ex. 19-5 Donald George Untimely Claim, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 20 4-28-08 Ltr to Cty re returned claim forms, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 21 4-28-08 ltr to Sonoma County DA re investigation into death of RG, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 22 5-2-2008 ltr from Spaulding McCullough Tansil re late claims, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 23 5-8-08 Ltr to Sonoma Cty Bd for leave to present late claims Final filed w- Bd and served, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 24 6-20-08 ltr from cty of Somona re Notice of Denial of Application for Late Claim)(Related document(s) #54 , #55 ) (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 55 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #60 . *** MOTION Petition for Relief from Cal. Govt. Code sec. 945.4 filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/12/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Order that Notice of Claim to Public Defendants was Timely, or in the Alternative, Petition for Order Relieving Plaintiffs from Cal.Govt.Code Section 945.4 Filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lance Wittels of Thomas Marc Litton (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 52 SUMMONS on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Edward W. Hard.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 51 SUMMONS on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Richard Flinders.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 50 SUMMONS on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Joseph N. Matel.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 49 SUMMONS on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Norick Janian.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #47 Stipulation filed by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa, Sutter Health. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 8, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 47 STIPULATION & proposed Order to Extend ADR Deadlines by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: OCTOBER 2, 2008 STIPULATION re #44 Case Management Statement filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 3, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 45 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George.. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Service waived by James Luders waiver sent on 9/17/2008, answer due 11/17/2008. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Service waived by Michael E. Dagey waiver sent on 9/17/2008, answer due 11/17/2008. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 41 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders.. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 40 ADR Clerk's Notice Re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ls7, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 24, 2008 Filing 39 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa.. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 38 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma.. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent/Declination to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge. Parties shall file their form no later than 10/3/2008. The hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #30 #34 is CONTINUED to 10/31/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 36 Proposed Order re #34 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 35 Declaration of Marcia Chadbourne in Support of #34 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed bySonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Sterling, Terry) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa re #32 Proposed Order, #31 First MOTION to Dismiss 1st, 3rd, 5th & 16th Causes of ActionFirst MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive DamagesFirst MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive Damages (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 32 Proposed Order re #31 First MOTION to Dismiss 1st, 3rd, 5th & 16th Causes of ActionFirst MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive DamagesFirst MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive Damages by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 31 First MOTION to Dismiss 1st, 3rd, 5th & 16th Causes of Action, First MOTION to Strike #25 Amended Complaint, re Punitive Damages filed by Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to James Luders, M.D. on 9/17/2008 by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Waiver of Service due by 10/17/2008. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Michael E. Dagey on 9/17/2008 by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. Waiver of Service due by 10/17/2008. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 10/10/2008 11:00 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2008. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 2, 2008 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George re #25 Amended Complaint, service on Dfts County of Sonoma, Sonoma Cty Sheriff's Dept, Bill Cogbill (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 2, 2008 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, James Luders, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. Filed byValerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re #19 Stipulation filed by Tajmah Beauchamp, Valerie George, Donald George. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 4, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Michael Dagey, R.N. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Laura Rodriguez (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to James Luders, M.D. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Elizabeth Kaiser (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
July 25, 2008 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to File Responsive Pleading after Plaintiffs File Amended Complaint by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Application of Steven L. Wittels for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice #13 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Application of David Sanford for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice #11 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 14, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Sutter Health (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
July 14, 2008 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to California Forensic Medical Group (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 14 PROPOSED Order Granting re #13 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Submitted by Plaintiffs Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp & Donald George. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Attorney Steven L. Wittels for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611021038] Filed by Plaintiffs Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp & Donald George. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 12 PROPOSED Order Granting re #11 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Submitted by Plaintiffs Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp & Donald George.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Attorney David Sanford for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice - [Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611021037] Filed by Plaintiffs Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp & Donald George. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File Responsive Pleading After Plaintiffs File Amended Complaint #8 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/3/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 2, 2008 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa (Non party physicians) (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
July 2, 2008 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [proposed] Order to File Responsive Pleading after Plaintiffs file Amended Complaint by Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Thornton, Larry) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
June 23, 2008 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Bill Cogbill (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to County of Sonoma (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 23, 2008 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George to Sonoma County Sheriff's Department (Wittels, Steven) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, Elizabeth Kaiser, James Luders, Laura Rodriguez, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa. (Attachments: #1 summons re Sutter Health, #2 summons re Laura Rodriguez, #3 summons re James Luders, #4 summons re E. Kaiser, #5 summons re M. Dagey, #6 summons re Cal. Forensic Medical Group, #7 summons re County of Sonoma, #8 summons re Bill Cogbill, #9 summons re Sonoma County Sheriff's Dept.)(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2008. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2008 03:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Laporte, #2 Standing Order re CMC, #3 Standing Order for all Judges)(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonoma County Sherrif's Department, Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Michael E. Dagey, Elizabeth Kaiser, James Luders, Laura Rodriguez, Sutter Health, Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611019610; summons issued). Filed by Valerie George, Tajmah Beauchamp, Donald George. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 28, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Sonoma County Sherrif's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie George
Represented By: Steven Lance Wittels
Represented By: David W. Sanford
Represented By: Katherine Leong
Represented By: Tanya Brannan
Represented By: Thomas Marc Litton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tajmah Beauchamp
Represented By: Steven Lance Wittels
Represented By: David W. Sanford
Represented By: Katherine Leong
Represented By: Tanya Brannan
Represented By: Thomas Marc Litton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald George
Represented By: Steven Lance Wittels
Represented By: David W. Sanford
Represented By: Katherine Leong
Represented By: Tanya Brannan
Represented By: Thomas Marc Litton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Sherrif's Department
Represented By: Gregory G. Spaulding
Represented By: Terry Scanlon Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Cogbill
Represented By: Gregory G. Spaulding
Represented By: Terry Scanlon Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Gregory G. Spaulding
Represented By: Terry Scanlon Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Michael E. Dagey
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kaiser
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. James Luders
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Rodriguez
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Health
Represented By: Larry Byron Thornton
Represented By: Barry Andrew Vogel
Represented By: Cameron Jay Whitehead
Represented By: Scott Hale Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa
Represented By: Larry Byron Thornton
Represented By: Barry Andrew Vogel
Represented By: Cameron Jay Whitehead
Represented By: Scott Hale Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward W. Hard, Jr.
Represented By: Carol C. Sleeth
Represented By: Daniel John Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Flinders
Represented By: Bryant Thomas French
Represented By: Joanna Lee Storey
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N. Matel
Represented By: Joanna Lee Storey
Represented By: Bryant Thomas French
Represented By: Marc Novak Zimmerman
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norick Janian
Represented By: Chester Andrew Rogaski, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Horsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Matheson, M.D.
Represented By: Ronald Paul Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?