People of the State of California ex rel. Edmund G. Brown Jr., Attorney General v. United States Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: People of the State of California ex rel. Edmund G. Brown Jr., Attorney General
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv02741
Filed: May 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; DISMISSAL re 37 Stipulation filed by United States Food and Drug Administration. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/5/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES re 35 Stipulation filed by United States Food and Drug Administration. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES re 33 Stipulation filed by United States Food and Drug Administration. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REQUESTING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE re 20 Stipulation filed by People of the State of California ex rel. Edmund G. Brown Jr., Attorney General. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 18 Stipulation filed by United States Food and Drug Administration. Signed by Judge 9/24/08 on 9/24/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Joint Case Management Statement filed by People of the State of California ex rel. Edmund G. Brown Jr., Attorney General. Signed by Judge Maria-Elana James on 9/3/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California ex rel. Edmund G. Brown Jr., Attorney General v. United States Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California ex rel. Edmund G. Brown Jr., Attorney General
Represented By: Laura Julie Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?