Loopt, Inc. v. Sponsorhouse, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Loopt, Inc.
Defendant: Sponsorhouse, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv02767
Filed: June 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 29 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/30/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
June 3, 2008 Filing 1
COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Lanham Act Violations, Unlawful Business Practices & Related Claims - [Summons Issued] against Sponsorhouse, Inc.,[Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 54611003310] Filed by Plaintiff Loopt, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loopt, Inc. v. Sponsorhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loopt, Inc.
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sponsorhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?