Azor v. Peake et al
Plaintiff: Suze Azor
Defendant: James B. Peake, Department of Veterans Affairs, Stacy Lumbang and Reny Famy
Case Number: 3:2008cv02825
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims shall be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agree d consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's claims against Lumbang, Famy, and the VA are dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/9/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT PEAKE'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Azor shall file proof of service of process on Peake no later than January 9, 2009, which proof of service of process shall demonstrate that Azor has complied, in f ull, with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). If such proof of service of process is not timely filed, Azor's claims against Peake will be dismissed. Further, should Azor seek to proceed on her complaint as against defend ants Stacy Lumbang and Reny Famy, Azor shall file proof of service of process on said defendants no later than January 9, 2009. If such proof of service is not timely filed, Azor's claims against said defendants will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER resetting CMC from 9/10/08 to 11/19/08. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azor v. Peake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suze Azor
Represented By: Ashwin Virji Ladva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Peake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Lumbang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reny Famy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?