Ashbaucher et al v. City of Arcata et al
Plaintiff: Hans K. Ashbaucher, Kimberly L. Starr, Johnie C. Miller, Michelle Hernandez and Kristofer Johnson
Defendant: City of Arcata, Michael Hackett, Arcata Police Department, Randy Mendoza, Tom Chapman, Martinez, Drake Goodall, County of Humbolt, Humbolt County Sheriff's Department, Gary Philp, Buihner, Chandler, Humboldt County Correctional Facility, Humboldt State University Police Department, Thomas Dewey, Lynne Soderberg, Rodney Dickerson, California Highway Patrol, City of Eureka, Eureka Police Department, City of Fortuna and Fortuna Police Department
Case Number: 3:2008cv02840
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 201 Rescheduling Case Management Deadlines filed by County of Humbolt, City of Arcata. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 198 Case Management Scheduling Order 196 For Extension of Case Management Deadlines filed by Kimberly L. Starr, Hans Karl Ashbaucher, Johnie C. Miller Discovery due by 7/6/2012. Dispositive Motion Hearing reset from 7/27/12 to 9/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 186 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, For Extension of Discovery Deadlines filed by Hans Karl Ashbaucher Discovery due by 5/25/2012.. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 4/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference filed by County of Humbolt, City of Arcata Settlement Conference set for 3/12/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 2/10/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re 188 Stipulation filed by Kimberly L. Starr, Hans Karl Ashbaucher, Johnie C. Miller. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 12/5/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER SETTING CMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 177 Stipulation filed by Kimberly L. Starr, Hans Karl Ashbaucher, Johnie C. Miller (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 173 Stipulation filed by Kimberly L. Starr, Hans Karl Ashbaucher, Johnie C. Miller Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/27/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER re draft revisions to Arcata Municipal Code Sections; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/24/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas Granting 156 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of the Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs to file their Third Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel ADOPTING Report and Recommendation in its entirety; The motion to involuntarily dismiss plaintiffs Michelle Hernandez and Kristoffer Johnson is GRANTED; Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in the Report and Recommendations (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Certificate of Service by Mail re: Docket No. 138.(cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER for clerk to issue summons on California Highway Patrol (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting defendants' request for extension of time to and including Case Management Conference continued to 10/20/2008 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/9/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashbaucher et al v. City of Arcata et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans K. Ashbaucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly L. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnie C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristofer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arcata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcata Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Goodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humbolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humbolt County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Philp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buihner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt State University Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Soderberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eureka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fortuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortuna Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?