Stop the Casino 101 Coalition et al v. Kempthorne et al
Plaintiff: Stop the Casino 101 Coalition, Chip Worthington, Linda Worthington, Marilee Montgomery, Orlean Koehle, Michael Erickson and Michael T. Healy
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne, Carl J. Artman, United States Department of the Interior, Jerry Gidner, Dale Morris and United States Bureau of Indian Affairs
Case Number: 3:2008cv02846
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JUDGMENT : Defenants' and Intervenor's motions to dismiss are granted. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 71 , 72 application to file surreply. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/26/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/27/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re: the filing of a corrected opposition. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/17/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting extension re 52 . Signed by Judge Illston on 3/6/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDE re 46 . Signed by Judge Illston on 1/29/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 30 HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stop the Casino 101 Coalition et al v. Kempthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stop the Casino 101 Coalition
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chip Worthington
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Worthington
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilee Montgomery
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlean Koehle
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Erickson
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Healy
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J. Artman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Gidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?