Mussumeli v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Bettina Mussumeli
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv02895
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COMPROMISE SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ordered that plaintiffs' claims be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/6/2008. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mussumeli v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettina Mussumeli
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?