Bank of America N.A. v. Micheletti Family Partnership et al
Petitioner: Bank of America N.A.
Respondent: Micheletti Family Partnership, Arthur Micheletti and Janice Micheletti
Case Number: 3:2008cv02902
Filed: June 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 77 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Adopting in Part Report and Recommendation. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 84 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 18, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 13, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 62 Stipulation to Extend Time to Object to Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 Stipulation Continuing Petitioner Bank of America's Deadline to File Attorneys' Fee Motion and Bill of Costs.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/27/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 14, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 Stipulation re Preservation Depositions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 3, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset from 9/19/2008 to October 17, 2008 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/16/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America N.A. v. Micheletti Family Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: James Benton Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Micheletti Family Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arthur Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janice Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?