Duarte v. The Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jose Duarte
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv03021
Filed: June 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING 70 Stipulation to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 28, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 62 Stipulation Continuance of Pretrial Deadlines and to Vacate Currently Scheduled Hearing Dates and Trial Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/18/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Oakland Unified School District's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 20, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 13, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Substitution of Counsel filed by Jose Duarte. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER STRIKING 41 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 11, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte v. The Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Salo Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?