The Board of Trustees et al v. Stump & Sons, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Stump & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv03036
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (60 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER continuing case management conference re 21 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Stump & Sons, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Case Management Conference - Further,, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES for Settlement Conference,, Set Hearings, Settlement Conference set for 4/27/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/15/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Stump & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stump & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?