Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California et al v. Holiday Savings Plan et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, -, Holiday Savings Plan and Anthony Asher
Defendant: T A M S, Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv03103
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 24 Motion for Default Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 9/25/09 is continued to 12/4/2009 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/08 is continued to 2/20/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/17/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California et al v. Holiday Savings Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, -
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Savings Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Asher
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T A M S, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?