Heidingsfelder v. Allied Waste Industries, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Robert Heidingsfelder
Defendant: Allied Waste Industries, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2008cv03116
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of dismissal re 16 . Signed by Judge Illston on 2/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for furhter proceedings. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER continuing cmc to 2/6/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/5/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heidingsfelder v. Allied Waste Industries, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Heidingsfelder
Represented By: Steven Orin Teal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Waste Industries, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?