Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. v. Biolitec, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Biolitec, Inc., Dornier Medtech America, Inc., New Star Lasers, Inc., David S. Centanni, Tyrell L. Schiek and biolitec, Inc.
Counter-claimant: New Star Lasers, Inc. and biolitec, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv03129
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 493 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION BY VNUS AND TVS FOR DISMISSAL OF TVS AND PARTIAL VACATUR OF VERDICT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 20, 2011 485 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR SHARI HEYEN, ESQ. TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 6, 2011 482 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD; VACATING HEARING. Jeremy M. Brodsky is terminated as attorney of record for plaintiff. The November 4, 2011 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 27, 2011 480 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The hearing on VNUS's motion for summary judgment is continued to October 21, 2011, at 9:00 a.m.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 9, 2011 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF BIOLITEC AND PARTIAL VACATUR OF VERDICT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 2, 2011 467 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
June 17, 2011 458 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR VNUS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT. Vnus's motion shall be filed no later than July 29, 2011, and a hearing shall be noticed for September 9, 2011. Opposition shall be filed no later than August 12, 2011, and the reply shall be filed no later than August 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
April 22, 2011 454 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. The telephonic Case Management Conference is continued from April 29, 2011 to June 10, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 3, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
February 7, 2011 449 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 447 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANTHONY F. MATHENY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
November 23, 2010 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING CERTAIN EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
October 25, 2010 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 19, 2010 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NEW STAR LASERS, INC., d/b/a COOLTOUCH, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 15, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO ADMIT CERTAIN EXHIBITS INTO EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 12, 2010 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR TRIAL; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 29, 2010 348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ADDENDA TO STIPULATIONS REFLECTED IN JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 16, 2010 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 15, 2010 338 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)(Filed September 15, 2010)
September 10, 2010 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
August 23, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART BIOLITEC, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION LIMITING DAMAGES. To the extent biolitec seeks summary judgment on VNUS's claim of c ontributory infringement as it pertains to 810 consoles, 980 consoles, and bare tip laser fibers, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 11, 2010 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT. To the extent TVS seeks summary judgment on VNUS's claim of direct infringement, the motion is granted. To the extent TVS seeks summary judgment on VNUS's claim of contributory infringement as it pertains to (a) introducers other than those greater than 11 cm in length that have markers and/or a locking adapter, (b) laser fibers, and (c) laser consoles, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 3, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT ASSERTED '433 AND '970 CLAIMS ARE INVALID FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 28, 2010 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND TVS'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 248 Opinion or Order of the Court CLARIFICATION ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE re 217 Stipulation, filed by Total Vein Solutions, LLC dba Total Vein Systems. Signed by Judge James Larson on 7/27/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 26, 2010 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 12, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 174 Statement filed by Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/29/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
April 26, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ALLEN S. RUGG PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 19, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
March 8, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANT TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 23, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRENT R. BELLOW PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 25, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
November 20, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES. The Pretrial Preparation Order is amended to set new discovery deadlines and obligations, as set forth in the parties' stipulation filed November 18, 2009. Further, a status conference is scheduled for May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 17, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES. The stipulated request is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 3, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR NOVEMBER 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 23, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SUBSTITUTING TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP D/B/A VNUS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES AS PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-CLAIM DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 2, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 6, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CHANGE DATE OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. The technology tutorial and claim construction hearing currently scheduled for August 17, 2009 is rescheduled for September 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 5, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
July 31, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
May 8, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. The Clerk is directed to file under seal the unredacted version of the Joint Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
March 30, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND PATENT L.R. 4-2 DEADLINE FOR EXCHANGE OF PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE. The deadline for the parties to exchange their Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence is extended from April 3, 2009 to April 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 3, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. The deadline to complete mediation is continued from May 1, 2009 to May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
January 26, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO BIFURCATE AND STAY THE EIGHTH THROUGH ELEVENTH COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC. TVS's Eighth, Ninth, Tenth, and Eleventh Counterclaims are bifurcated and stayed pending resolution of the remainder of the parties' claims and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 23, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. The Court informs the parties the Court will construe no more than ten terms in connection with the claim construction hearing, i.e., the terms identified by the parties as the "most significant" pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-3(c). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 22, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 16, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SCHEDULING OF PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS, AND PROPOSED TERMS FOR CONSTRUCTION. The deadline for VNUS to serve Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions is continued to February 12 , 2009. The deadline for defendants to serve Preliminary Invalidity Contentions is continued to March 13, 2009. The deadline to exchange proposed terms for construction and to meet and confer is continued to March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 12, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO ADJOURN DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC. Plaintiff's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to TVS's counterclaims is adjourned to January 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 2, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE. The appearances of Jerry R. Selinger, Henry M. Pogorzelski, and John C. Carey, on behalf of Total Vein Solutions LLC d/b/a Total Vein Systems, are withdrawn. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 18, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DAVID S. CENTANNI AND TYRELL L. SCHIEK AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES. Defendants David S. Centanni and Tyrell L. Schiek are dismissed with prejudice. VNUS v. biolitec et al., C-08-3129, is consolidated for all pu rposes with VNUS v. TVS, C-08-4234. The caption of every pleading filed in these consolidated actions shall denote lead case number C-08-3129, and all papers filed and served to date in either of the foregoing cases are deemed a part of the record in the consolidated actions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 30, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD W. MILLER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Vnus Medical Technologies, Inc. v. Biolitec, Inc., C-08-3129, is related to Vnus Medical Technologies, Inc. v. Total Vein Solutions, Inc., 08-4234. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 22, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT DORNIER MEDTECH AMERICA, INC. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 17, 2008 to November 14, 2008. Plaintiff is ordered to serve defendant Dornier Medtech America, Inc., no later than October 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 17, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT BIOLITEC, INC. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 15, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL N. RADER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. v. Biolitec, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Chung Gyun Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biolitec, Inc.
Represented By: Charles T. Steenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dornier Medtech America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Star Lasers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stirrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Centanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrell L. Schiek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: biolitec, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Alan Slavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: New Star Lasers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stirrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: biolitec, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Alan Slavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?