Rambus Inc. v. Nvidia Corporation
Plaintiff: Rambus Inc.
Defendant: Nvidia Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv03343
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/13/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER denying Appeal of the Discovery Master's Order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER ADJUSTING DISCLOSURE AND MARKMAN SCHEDULE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER re: stipulation #165 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting extension to oppose administrative motion to relate cases re 170 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) Modified on 12/9/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CORRECT ORDER GRANTING NVIDIA'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 scheduling ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. COUNSEL MAY ATTEND BY PHONE IF NECESSARY (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER continuing cmc to 8/27/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER continuing cmc to 6/18/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE: MARACH 12, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER continuing cmc to 3/12/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting substitution (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Granting re (128 in 3:08-cv-03343-SI) Joint Stipulation Regarding Scheduling and Discovery filed by Rambus Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2010 03:00 PM. Joint case management statement due by 2/5/2010.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/5/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER APPOINTING THE HONORABLE EDWARD INFANTE (RET.) AS SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF THE HONORABLE EDWARD INFANTE (RET.)AS SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re: case management conference statement re 104 . Signed by Judge Illston on 3/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TENTATIVE RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR DISMISSAL OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS. 08-3343 AND 08-5500. Granting 71 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY re 60 . Litigation on the Barth/Ware patent is stayed until the ITC issues a Final Decision. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT re 34 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rambus Inc. v. Nvidia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambus Inc.
Represented By: Julie Sandra Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nvidia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?