Bay Marine Boatworks Inc v. The Vessel Hali, her engines, tackle, licenses and appurtenances, Official Number 50036, in rem
Plaintiff: Bay Marine Boatworks Inc
Defendant: The Vessel Hali, her engines, tackle, licenses and appurtenances, Official Number 50036, in rem
Case Number: 3:2008cv03352
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 23 Stipulation filed by Bay Marine Boatworks Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/20/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPOINTING CHRISTOPHER GOODROE FOR LIMITED PURPOSES. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/10/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONON COUNSEL FOR LIMITED PURPOSES. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/27/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Marine Boatworks Inc v. The Vessel Hali, her engines, tackle, licenses and appurtenances, Official Number 50036, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Marine Boatworks Inc
Represented By: George Wesley Nowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vessel Hali, her engines, tackle, licenses and appurtenances, Official Number 50036, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?