Nguyen v. Starbucks Coffee Corporation
Plaintiff: Mai-Trang Thi Nguyen
Defendant: Starbucks Coffee Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv03354
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on December 22, 2009. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (68) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (76) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:08-cv-03354-CRB; terminating (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:09-cv-00047-CRB. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER to continue trial date re (64 in 3:08-cv-03354-CRB) Stipulation filed by Starbucks Coffee Corporation Bench Trial set for 2/8/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/05/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Starbucks Coffee Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mai-Trang Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Coffee Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?