Terilogy Co Ltd v. Glimmerglass Networks Inc
Plaintiff: Terilogy Co Ltd
Defendant: Glimmerglass Networks Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv03364
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 Stipulation for dismissal filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 Stipulation, filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc Discovery due by 7/22/2009.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 44 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 Stipulation filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terilogy Co Ltd v. Glimmerglass Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terilogy Co Ltd
Represented By: Mark Dean Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glimmerglass Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?