Madsen v. Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Larry F. Madsen
Defendant: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv03379
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (60 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Chalres R. Breyer on 7/7/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER continuing date for filing pretrial submissions re 40 Stipulation, filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 23 Motion to Shorten Time. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Stipulation filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 21 Stipulation, 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment And Alternative Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/17/2009. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/8/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 15 Affidavit,, filed by Larry F. Madsen, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 Affidavit,, 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment And Alternative Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/10/2009. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madsen v. Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry F. Madsen
Represented By: Michael B. Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?