Kyi v. Chertoff
Plaintiff: Aye Aye Kyi
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Case Number: 3:2008cv03383
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Naturalization Application Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: Review of denial of an application for naturalization

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 9 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/3/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Reply Papers. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 10, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 11 Joint MOTION to be Exempt From the Formal ADR Process. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyi v. Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aye Aye Kyi
Represented By: Justin X. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?