Zaldana v. KB Home et al
Plaintiff: Hugo Zaldana
Defendant: KB Home, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Mortgage Ventures, L.L.C., Landsafe, Inc. and Landsafe Appraisal Services, Inc.
3rd Party Defendant: Homesafe Escrow Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv03399
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to stipulation, the action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/29/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE: STIPULATION RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND RENOTICING HEARING. Pursuant to stipulation, the hearing on defendants' motion to stay is continued to September 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/5/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Granting 150 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen S. Walters; Keith David Yandell; Anton LeBlanc Hasenkampf and Marshall C. Wallace terminated as counsel for First American defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Charles A. Newman is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for First American defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. Granting 131 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine. M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/2/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER COUNTRYWIDE CLAIMS FROM FIRST AMERICAN CLAIMS. Defendants' motion 117 is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference is continued to December 17, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/21/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANT. The parties' stipulation to substitute First American Financial Corporation for The First American Corporation is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 84 FIRST AMERICAN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING 83 KB HOMES' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STIPULATION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 25, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 20, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 29, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motions, the Court deems the matters suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for December 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE DATE FOR FILING REPLY BRIEFS. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing therefor, the Court's August 31, 2009 Order Re: filing of Third Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule shall be modified to extend the date for filing of Reply Briefs to November 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RESCHEDULING SEPTEMBER 25, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to January 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 31, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF STACEY L. GORMAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER VACATING MAY 8, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE MARCH 6, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to June 12, 2009. Should the parties, after the SAC is filed, determine an earlier date is preferable, they may submit a joint stipulation to that effect. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING COUNTRYWIDE AND FIRST AMERICAN'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART KB HOME'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Any Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than March 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF NAOKA E. CAREY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES. The Case Management Conference is continued to March 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. Defendants shall file and serve responsive pleadings, or motions to dismiss, on or before December 8, 2008. If any defendant files a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs' opposition p apers shall be served and filed on or before January 16, 2009; defendants' reply papers shall be served and filed on or before January 30, 2009; and any motion to dismiss hearing shall take place on February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to December 19, 2008. Defendants' responsive pleadings shall be filed no later than December 1, 2008, and any Motion to Dismiss hearings shall be set no earlier than January 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaldana v. KB Home et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Zaldana
Represented By: Charlotte Elizabeth Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Mortgage Ventures, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landsafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landsafe Appraisal Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Homesafe Escrow Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?