United States, ex rel. et al v. Hebrard et al
Plaintiff: United States, ex rel. and Bonnie Lammers
Defendant: Michael Hebrard, Richard Lavigna, Farideh Heidarpour, Ali Heidarpour, Advanced Physical Medicine & Rehab Group, Inc., Advanced Occupational Rehabilitation, Inc., Advanced Medicine and Rehabilitation of Texas, Inc. and Advanced Medicine and Rehabilitation of Texas, PA
Case Number: 3:2008cv03411
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 80 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PARTIES by Hon. William Alsup granting 78 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William Alsup granting 63 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING STAY re 42 Status Report filed by A.B.C. Billing, Inc., Ali Heidarpour, Farideh Heidarpour. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 18, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 NOTICE; United States' Notice of Election to Intervene, filed by United States, ex rel. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on November 1, 2011. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States, ex rel. et al v. Hebrard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States, ex rel.
Represented By: Julie Ann Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Lammers
Represented By: Donald R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hebrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lavigna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farideh Heidarpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Heidarpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Physical Medicine & Rehab Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Occupational Rehabilitation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medicine and Rehabilitation of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medicine and Rehabilitation of Texas, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?