Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) v. Chirolo et al
Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.)
Defendant: Mary Catherine Chirolo, Denise Elizabeth McShane, Nanci Ann Severietti Boyd, Linda Marie Severietti Torres, Theodore Vincent Severietti, Victoria Anne Taylor Chavez and Estate of Sean B. McShane
Case Number: 3:2008cv03465
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1335 Interpleader Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS by Judge William Alsup [granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT THEODORE VINCENT SEVERIETTI WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 3, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LINDA MARIE SEVERIETTI TORRES WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 12, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS NANCI BOYD AND VICTORIA CHAVEZ WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 7, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 23 Second MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Renewed Request for Continuance of Scheduling Conference or Alternatively, Allowing Telephonic Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel Due to Pending Case Resolution filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.)]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/6/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 13 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance at Case Management Conference; Request to Continue Hearing to November 6, 2008; Proposed Order; Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.)]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/21/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 7 Status Report, filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.)]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/3/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) v. Chirolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.)
Represented By: Daniel William Maguire, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Catherine Chirolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Elizabeth McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanci Ann Severietti Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Marie Severietti Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Vincent Severietti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Anne Taylor Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Sean B. McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?