Damon v. Fenton
Plaintiff: John Damon
Defendant: Richard R. Fenton
Case Number: 3:2008cv03488
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/18/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 6/5/9, at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 6/19/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. ENE is extended to 5/28/9. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 5/1/9 at 1:30 PM, has been rescheduled for 6/5/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/25/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/22/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/29/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Stipulation filed by John Damon. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damon v. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Damon
Represented By: Jacob William Sider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard R. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?