Powell v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Beverly Powell
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2008cv03655
Filed: July 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 18 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. The parties having stipulated that this matter has been resolved in its entirety and each side to bear their own attorneys fees and costs, this matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/11/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/8/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting Private ADR re 13 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Deadline for ADR session - 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/21/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Powell
Represented By: Frank N. Darras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Sean Patrick Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?