Hain v. United States Department of the Navy
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Petitioner: Jack Hain
Case Number: 3:2008cv03747
Filed: April 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/21/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by United States Department of the Navy. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXCUSE PARTY REPRESENTATIVE FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/9/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENTCONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/18/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/6/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 granting as modified STIPULATION selecting ADR process. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/3/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008) Modified on 11/4/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hain v. United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jack Hain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: Edward A. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?