Hom v. DHL Express (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Hom
Defendant: DHL Express (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv03756
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 30:181 Environment: Review of Agency Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge James Larson granting 51 Motion for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 49 Stipulation filed by DHL Express (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/14/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 43 Stipulation filed by DHL Express (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/17/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE re 41 Stipulation filed by DHL Express (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/11/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING re 39 Proposed Order filed by DHL Express (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/20/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Stipulation filed by Richard Hom. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/10/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Case Management Statement filed by Richard Hom. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/15/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Richard Hom. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/10/09. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION re 25 Stipulation filed by Richard Hom. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/15/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Case Management Statement filed by DHL Express (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/11/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hom v. DHL Express (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hom
Represented By: Stephen Bryan Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?