Allen v. Homeq Servicing Inc
Plaintiff: John Allen
Defendant: Homeq Servicing Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv03798
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION; CONTINUING HEARING. No later than April 3, 2009, Allen, through counsel, shall file a supplemental brief. No later than April 17, 2009, HomEq shal l file any supplemental opposition. No later than April 24, 2009, Allen shall file any reply. The hearing on the motion is hereby CONTINUED to May 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Defendant's Request to Appear and Participate at Mediation by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/12/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT HOMEQ SERVICING, INC.'S ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant's answer to the Third Amended Complaint is stricken, without prejudice to defendant's refiling said document and timely submitting a chambers copy thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. The deadline to complete mediation is extended to March 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/17/2008. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Homeq Servicing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Allen
Represented By: Shawn Ridgell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeq Servicing Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?