Boston Scientific Corp. v. Medtronic Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corp.
Defendant: Medtronic Inc., Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc. and Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2008cv03844
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/29/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING PRIVATE MEDIATION re 25 Stipulation filed by Boston Scientific Corp. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Stipulation filed by Boston Scientific Corp. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/10/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 25 Stipulation filed by Boston Scientific Corp. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/14/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/3/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Scientific Corp. v. Medtronic Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corp.
Represented By: Wallace W. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?