United States of America v. Bradley Mining Company et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bradley Mining Company and Frederick Bradley
Case Number: 3:2008cv03968
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting re 81 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for The United States. Attorney Rochelle Leigh Russell Terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. Cases C08-3968 TEH and C08-5501 are Consolidated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/05/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference to 9/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco and 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment Hearing to 3/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/11/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to 5/9/2011 at 01:30 PM and 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment Hearing to 6/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/2011(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 2/7/2011 at 01:30 PM and the Motion Hearing to 3/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/08/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM and the Motion Hearing to 11/29/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/02/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 8/2/2010 at 01:30 PM and the Motion Hearing to 8/30/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/27/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference is set for 5/3/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing is continued to 6/7/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/05/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend answer deadline. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER regarding matters raised at 02/01/10 case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/04/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to 02/01/2010 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/29/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to 7/27/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/20/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Stay and continuance of Initial Case Management Conference to 4/20/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/14/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting ADR process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bradley Mining Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ronald J. Tenpas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Mining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?