Tiwari v. NBC Universal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anurag Tiwari
Defendant: NBC Universal, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv03988
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Dismissal of Action filed by Anurag Tiwari. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER RESETTING STATUS FROM 7/6/12 TO 9/21/12 AT 10:30 A.M. Status Report due by 9/14/2012. Status Conference set for 9/21/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 126 for Continuance of May 18, 2012 Status Conference and to Vacate April 24, 2012 Deadline for Mandatory Settlement Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by NBC Universal, Inc. Status Report due by 6/29/2012. Status Conference set for 7/6/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration and Granting Plaintiff's Alternative Motion for Clarification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS re 116 Stipulation filed by NBC Universal, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 112 Stipulation filed by NBC Universal, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/8/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 79 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 85 Defendant's Motion to Strike; and Denying 84 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION HEARING re 85 First MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff Anurag Tiwari's Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress and Defamation Claims filed by NBC Universa l, Inc., 79 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Anurag Tiwari's 42 U.S.C §1983 Claim. filed by NBC Universal, Inc., 84 First MOTION for Protective Order filed by NBC Universal, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 5/23/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/28/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE-SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/25/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Stipulation filed by NBC Universal, Inc.. Signed by Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/16/10. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending stay of action 30 days; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/30/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing stay of action to 1/15/2010; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/4/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiwari v. NBC Universal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anurag Tiwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?