Chandler v. City of Emeryville et al
Plaintiff: Craig Chandler
Defendant: City of Emeryville and Edward Suen
Case Number: 3:2008cv04010
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 Stipulation re dismissal filed by Edward Suen, City of Emeryville. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER resetting status conf. re 29 Stipulation filed by Edward Suen, Craig Chandler, City of Emeryville. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/21/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Stipulation filed by Edward Suen, City of Emeryville. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/17/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Letter filed by Edward Suen, City of Emeryville. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/4/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. City of Emeryville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Chandler
Represented By: Pamela Yvette Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Emeryville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Suen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?