IO Group, Inc. v. Antelope Media, LLC
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Defendant: Antelope Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv04050
Filed: August 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TURNOVER ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Plaintiff is directed to file under seal the documents identified in the Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in support of plaintiff's administrative request. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEE AWARD. The Court awards attorney's fees in the amount of $8990 and costs in the amount of $1508.67. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Maxine M. Chesney (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of IO Group, Inc. against Antelope Media, LLC, PSI Services, SA, Sunrise Media, Ltd., Mike Hermann, Thorsten Palicki, plaintiff's application for defdault judgment is hereby GRANTED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; PERMANENT INJUNCTION; VACATING JUNE 4, 2010 HEARING. Plaintiff shall have judgment against defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $1,350,000. Defendants are enjoined from copying, posting or making any other infringing use or infringing distribution of plaintiff's audiovisual works, photographs, or other copyrighted material, and enjoined from transferring any domain name, or the proceeds thereof, formerly r egistered to Antelope, until such time as the judgment entered herein has been paid. To the extent the application seeks an award of full costs, including attorney's fees, the application is granted, and plaintiff shall file a motion for its full costs, including attorney's fees, no later than 14 days from the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 5, 2010 to March 12, 2010. A Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT SUNRISE'S JANUARY 21, 2010 FILING; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Plaintiff is afforded leave to supplement, no later than February 5, 2010, its request for entry of default, specifically, to state whether the emails it sent to Sunrise and PSI were returned as undeliverable. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER STRIKING 81 DOCUMENT FILED BY DEFENDANTS ON NOVEMBER 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO CONDUCT COURT BUSINESS IN ENGLISH; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The parties are directed to file all documents in English, or, to the extent a document in a language o ther than English must be filed, to provide therewith an English translation of the text. With respect to the document filed by defendants Maik Herrmann and Thorsten Palicki on November 20, 2009, which document is in the German language, the Court directs said defendants to file, no later than January 15, 2010, an English language version of said document.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SERVE DEFENDANTS SUNRISE MEDIA, LTD AND PSI SERVICES, SA VIA ELECTRONIC MAIL. Plaintiff shall file its Third Amended Complaint within 5 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff shall serve Sunrise Media, Ltd., and PSI Services, SA, by electronic mail, and shall file a proof of service with the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND TO SERVE VIA E-MAIL. The December 18, 2009 hearing is vacated. Defendants Palicki and Herrmann are ordered to file any papers in opposition to plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint and to Serve Defendants via Electronic Mail within five court days of the date plaintiff electronically serves them with a copy of this order. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Palicki and Herrmann, and to file proof of such service forthwith. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 30, 2009 to February 5, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT SUNRISE MEDIA, LTD. The deadline to serve Sunrise Media, Ltd. is extended to sixty days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's claims against Patrick Schwarz and Newhaven are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS PALICKI AND HERRMANN TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT. The deadline for Palicki and Herrmann to file a response is extended to October 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF IO GROUP'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint no later than April 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS SUNRISE MEDIA, LTD., MIKE HERMANN, AND THORSTEN PALICKI; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff is directed to serve Sunrise Media, Ltd., Mike Hermann, and Thorsten Palicki no later than May 29, 20 09. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 20, 2009 to July 10, 2009. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR LEAVE TO TAKE EARLY DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; STRIKING LETTERS FILED BY HERRMANN AND PALICKI; GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE T O SUPPLEMENT MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING JANUARY 16, 2009 HEARING. The two letters signed by Herrmann and Palicki and filed by the Clerk on October 23, 2008 and January 5, 2009, respectively, are stricken. The November 18, 2008 order to show cause is discharged. Plaintiff shall file its First Amended Complaint within ten days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is afforded leave to supplement its Miscellaneous Administrative Request by f iling, no later than ten days from the date of this order, Exhibit A. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 30, 2009 to March 20, 2009, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Conference shall be filed no later than March 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than December 5, 2008, why the instant matter should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. Defendant, no later than December 19, 2008, may file a response to plaintiff's showing. As of December 19, 2008, the Court will take the matter under submission, unless the parties are otherwise informed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection; and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/4/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IO Group, Inc. v. Antelope Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?