Securities & Exchange Commission v. Brake
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: John Earl Brake
Case Number: 3:2008cv04089
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER AFTER STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/11/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FINDING CONTEMPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2010: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahy, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE re 30 MOTION to Continue Unopposed Application to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates in Light of Proposed Settlement; [Proposed] Order Granting Continuance filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/20/2009. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE SEC's NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/11/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 22 Proposed Order filed by John Earl Brake. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/18/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/13/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kristin Elise Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Earl Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?