Garlick v. Compass Vision, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lorie Garlick
Defendant: Compass Vision, Inc. and National Medical Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04118
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 89 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE re 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611044707.) filed by Compass Vision, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/16/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/3/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garlick v. Compass Vision, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorie Garlick
Represented By: Norman Perlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Vision, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?